Landon v. The West Baton Rouge Council et al

Plaintiff: Brenda Landon
Defendant: The Parish of West Baton Rouge, Philip A. Padgett, M.D. and The West Baton Rouge Council
Case Number: 3:2013cv00261
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The 24 Motion to Alter or Amend Ruling and/or Motion for New Trial and/or Motion for Reconsideration is granted in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/12/2013. (NLT)
October 4, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Philip A. Padgett, M.D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/4/2013. (JDL)
August 29, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 12(d), Fed.R.Civ.P., the parties are hereby notified that the defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(1), Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction is converted to a Rule 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Parties shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file any additional summary judgment materials as set forth in Rule 56(c) or a supplemental memorandum of law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 08/29/2013. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landon v. The West Baton Rouge Council et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Parish of West Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip A. Padgett, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The West Baton Rouge Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Landon
Represented By: Dan Michael Scheuermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?