Richardson v. Axion Logistics, LLC

Petitioner: Justin Shane Richardson
Respondent: Axion Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00302
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2016 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 MOTION to Exclude or Limit the Expert Report, Opinions, and Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Dr. James A. Richardson subject to the Court's discretion to elicit testimony from Dr. James A. Richardson after trial. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/25/2016. (LLH)
May 4, 2016 123 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying Axion's 84 Motion for Summary Judgment. Mr. Richardson's 99 Motion to Strike Evidence Offered in Support of Defendant Axion Logistics, LLC's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT. Within 14 days of the issuance of this Ruling and Order Mr. Richardson shall file a response to Axion's 86 Motion to Exclude or Limit the Report, Opinions, and Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Dr. James A. Richardson. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/3/2016. (LLH)
December 7, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The 64 Motion for a Limited Exception to the Discovery Deadline and 67 the Emergency Motion for Protection from Plaintiff's Informal Request for Discovery from and Proposed Subpoena to Non-Party James Hall GRANTED in part and DENIED in part consistent with the foregoing arrangement agreed upon by the parties as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/7/2015. (BCL)
June 18, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: Plaintiff's 42 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice, or Alternatively, Defer Ruling on Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs Pursuant to La. Rev. Stat. 23:967 is GRANTED IN PART. Defendant's 38 MOTION for Attorney's Fees is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pending the result of Plaintiff's appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/18/2014. (SMG)
March 12, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss Initial Complaint and granting 14 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Richardson's claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/12/2014. (LLH)
October 7, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Quash Plaintiffs Subpoena Duces Tecum and Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 10/4/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Axion Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Axion Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Donna Phillips Currault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Justin Shane Richardson
Represented By: Dale R. Baringer
Represented By: James S. Holliday, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin John Barrow Klein
Represented By: Aaron David Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?