Varnado v. LeBlanc et al
Plaintiff: |
Hymel Varnado |
Defendant: |
Burl Cain, Stephanie Lamartiniere, James LeBlanc and Kenneth Norris |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00348 |
Filed: |
May 31, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Baton Rouge Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian A. Jackson |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen C. Riedlinger |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 3, 2016 |
Filing
220
RULING: The Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 198 is GRANTED filed by Hymel Varnado. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/03/2016. (ELW)
|
January 25, 2016 |
Filing
139
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The court allows consolidation for discovery, but DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the portion of the Consolidation Motion asking for consolidation for trial. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/22/2016. (LLH)
|
February 20, 2015 |
Filing
91
OPINION Adopting the 89 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Defendant's 74 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part, dismissing any claim made on behalf of other prisoners and any other claim asserted in his Complaint except for his deliberate medical indifference claim against the defendants based on the failure to timely provide him with hernia surgery, and denying the remainder of the defendant's motion. The Plaintiff's 81 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claims and these claims are dismissed without prejudice and this action is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on the plaintiff's Eighth Amendment deliberate medical indifference claim. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 2/20/2015. (LLH)
|
December 11, 2014 |
Filing
87
RULING denying 62 OBJECTION to Untimeliness and Validity of Responses to Request for Admissions and Interrogatories, MOTION to Strike, MOTION to Uphold FRCP Rules 33(b)(4) and 36(a)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/11/2014. (LLH)
|
March 6, 2014 |
Filing
60
RULING AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report (Doc. 44) 1s ADOPTED as the Court's opinion herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Hymel Varnado's Order to Show Ca use for A[n] Injunction (sic) (Doc. 3) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/6/2014. (PJH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?