Firefighters' Retirement System et al v. Citco Group Limited et al
Plaintiff: Firefighters' Retirement System and Municipal Employees Retirement System and New Orleans Firefighters' Pension & Relief Fund
Defendant: Citco (Canada), Inc., Citco Bank Nederland, N.V. Dublin Branch, Citco Banking Corporation, N.V., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Fund Services (Cayman Islands), Limited, Citco Fund Services (Europe) BV, Citco Fund Services (Suisse) S.A., Citco Global Custody N.V., Citco Group Limited, Citco N.V., Citco Technology Management, Inc., Citco USA, Consulting Services Group, LLC, Denis Kiely, Duhallow Financial Services, LLC, Fletcher Asset Management, Inc., Alphonse Fletcher, Jr., Grant Thornton International Ltd, Joe Meals, Lisa Alexander, Non-Series N Shareholders, Peter M. Zayfert and Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
Unknown: David M. Cheifetz
Case Number: 3:2013cv00373
Filed: June 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 RULING granting 1000 Motion for Rule 54(b) Certification. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/15/2020. (SWE)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 963 RULING granting 960 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Alphonse "Buddy" Fletcher, Jr. and Fletcher Asset Management, Inc. as to liability. The Court will set a hearing for Plaintiffs to provide evidence regarding the amount of damages that are warranted in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 2/22/2019. (SWE)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 929 RULING granting 738 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Negligent Misrepresentation Claim (Count 11) filed by Citco Banking Corporation, N.V.. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/14/2019. (SWE)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 883 RULING denying 732 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by New Orleans Firefighters' Pension & Relief Fund, Municipal Employees Retirement System of Louisiana, Firefighters' Retirement System. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/18/2018. (SWE)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 879 RULING: The 723 Motion for Summary Judgment by the CSG Defendants (CSG and Joe Meals) is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/14/2018. (KAH)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 858 RULING: The 660 Ruling and Order on the Motion to Compel is AFFIRMED and the 673 Objection is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/21/2018. (KAH)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 849 RULING denying 672 OBJECTION to a Magistrate Judge's Order (Rule 72a) re 668 Order on Motion to Compel by Firefighters' Retirement System, Municipal Employees Retirement System of Louisiana, New Orleans Firefighters' Pension & Relief Fund filed by New Orleans Firefighters' Pension & Relief Fund, Municipal Employees Retirement System of Louisiana, Firefighters' Retirement System. The Magistrate Judge's 668 Ruling is hereby AFFIRMED. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/13/2018. (SWE)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 705 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 662 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to provide a supplemental response to interrogatory number 4 by revising the Master Response and by providing a supplemental response to subparts (v) and (vi) of the interrogatory. Citco Defendants Motion to Compel supplemental responses to CFS Cayman interrogatory number 10, Citco Banking interrogatory number 10, CTM interrogatory number 10, and Citco Group interrogatory number 11 and CFS Cayman interrog atory number 20 to FRS are DENIED. Defendants Motion to Compel a supplemental response to CFS Cayman interrogatory number 22 is DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall provide to the Citco Defendants the revised Master Response, as well as Plaintiffs supplemental responses to the interrogatories as ordered herein, within twenty-one (21) days of this Ruling and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 08/17/2018. (ELW)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 668 RULING AND ORDER denying 578 Motion to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Supplemental Privilege Log Pursuant to Court Order (ECF 513). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/21/2018. (LLH)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 664 RULING AND ORDER granting 661 Motion for Reconsideration of Ruling on Liquidation Committee Minutes (ECF 660). The Citco Defendants' 589 Motion to Compel Production of Arbitrage and Leveraged Liquidation Committee Minutes is DENIED. The Cour t's previous Order requiring Plaintiffs to produce entries corresponding to PG ID 14 & 17 on Plaintiffs' Privilege Log Re: Redactions of Leverage Liquidation and Arbitrage Liquidation Committee Minutes is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/15/2018. (SGO)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 660 RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 589 MOTION to Compel Production of Arbitrage and Leveraged Liquidation Committee Minutes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/10/2018. (SGO)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 618 RULING denying 558 MOTION to Extend Discovery on Grant Thornton LLP After the March 15, 2018 Discovery Cutoff. The Request for Expedited Consideration is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/16/2018. (SGO)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 557 RULING AND ORDER granting in part 538 Motion to Compel. CFS Cayman is ORDERED to produce SAS 70 reports for the time period of 1/1/2007 through 9/1/2010 within fourteen (14) days of this Ruling. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/9/2018. (LLH)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 525 NOTICE AND ORDER Regarding In Camera Review Citco Defendants produce the documents corresponding to log entry numbers 211, 212, and 213 to Plaintiffs within seven (7) days of this Notice and Order due by 1/31/2018. Citco Defendants produce redacted v ersions of the documents corresponding to log entry numbers 945, 946, 950, 964, and 1837 as set forth above to Plaintiffs within seven (7) days of this Notice and Order; Citco Defendants unredact the previously redacted portion of the document corres ponding to log entry number 2109 and produce the entire document corresponding to log entry number 2109 to Plaintiffs within seven (7) days of this Notice and Order due by 1/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 01/24/2018. (ELW)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 515 RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 483 Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Privilege Log. IT IS ORDERED that Firefighters Retirement System, Municipal Employees Retirement System of Loui siana and New Orleans Firefighters Pension & Relief Fund shall, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Ruling and Order, either: (1) remove items corresponding to log entry numbers 979, 2231, 2582, 3033, 3086, and 3389 from their privilege log and produce those documents or (2) revise log entry numbers 979, 2231, 2582, 3033, 3086, and 3389 to adequately state the privilege asserted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 01/08/2018. (EWD)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 513 RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 481 to Continue Submission Date on Motion to Compel Privileged Documents or Alternative Motion to Compel Privileged Documents . Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/5/2018. (LLH) Modified on 1/5/2018 to edit text (LLH).
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 512 RULING AND ORDER denying 484 Renewed Motion to Compel on Documents in the Control of The Citco Group, Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/3/2018. (LLH)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 508 NOTICE AND ORDER RE: 481 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Motion to Compel Privileged Documents or Alternative MOTION to Compel Privileged Documents, and 483 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Privilege Log. On or before 12/29/2017, Parties shall file documents as written. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/20/2017. (LLH)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 476 RULING AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 429 Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED. The Citco Defendants shall produce Group One documents for the date range of 6/16/2010 through 9/1/2010 within thirty (30) days of this Ruling and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/30/2017. (LLH)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 437 RULING denying 365 MOTION to Dismiss Citco Fund Services (Suisse) S.A. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/14/2017. (LLH)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 433 RULING : Motion for Reconsideration 338 AND 339 Motion for Reconsideration are DENIED. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 08/08/2017. (ELW)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 426 RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 412 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/26/2017. (LLH)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 410 RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 387 Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses as set forth in the attached ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/29/2017. (EDC)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 163 Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 09/30/2016. (Alcon, Barbara)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 323 RULING: The 59 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is GRANTED and 59 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Relief is DISMISSED AS MOOT. The 71 Motion to Continue Submission Date is DENIED. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/15/2016. (LLH)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 RULING adopting the 294 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge dated 7/6/2016. Accordingly, the 117 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York is denied. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/26/2016. (LLH)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 287 RULING granting 68 Citgo Technology Management, Inc's FRCP(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Citgo Technology Management, Inc's Motions to Dismiss for Failure to Meet the Pleading Requirements of Rule 8(a) of the FRCP, and Failure to State a Claim for Relief are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/21/2016. (JDL)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER denying 212 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, 213 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on 212 Emergency MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, 214 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Addressing the Divesting of this Court's Jurisdiction to Send Certified Copy of Remand Order to State Court and 216 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay, without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/28/2014. (LLH)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 RULING AND ORDER OF REMAND adopting the 204 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and granting the 60 Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to appropriate judicial district court). This matter is remanded to the 19th JDC for the Parish of East Baton Rouge. Plaintiff's request for costs and expenses under 28 U.S.C, § 1447(c) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/18/2014. (LLH)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 52 , 83 , 84 , 110 and 139 Motions to Continue. Pending determination of subject matter jurisdiction, the Court hereby GRANTS the Plaintiffs' motions requesting the Court to continue without date its consideration of each Defendants' dispositive motions. If the Court finds it has subject matter jurisdiction, it will then consider personal jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/9/2013. (SMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firefighters' Retirement System et al v. Citco Group Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco (Canada), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco Bank Nederland, N.V. Dublin Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco Banking Corporation, N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited
Represented By: Michael R. Allweiss
Represented By: Amy J. Beaux
Represented By: Alicia M. Bendana
Represented By: Kelley A. Cornish
Represented By: Andrew G. Gordon
Represented By: Robert N. Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco Fund Services (Cayman Islands), Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco Fund Services (Europe) BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco Fund Services (Suisse) S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco Global Custody N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco Technology Management, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Allweiss
Represented By: Amy J. Beaux
Represented By: Alicia M. Bendana
Represented By: Kelley A. Cornish
Represented By: Andrew G. Gordon
Represented By: Robert N. Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citco USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consulting Services Group, LLC
Represented By: Justin P. Lemaire
Represented By: Paul James Masinter
Represented By: Michael Q. Walshe, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas John Wehlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Kiely
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: David Matthew Kerth
Represented By: James Conner Percy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duhallow Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: David Matthew Kerth
Represented By: James Conner Percy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fletcher Asset Management, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: David Matthew Kerth
Represented By: James Conner Percy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphonse Fletcher, Jr.
Represented By: Robert B. Bieck, Jr.
Represented By: David Matthew Kerth
Represented By: James Conner Percy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Thornton International Ltd
Represented By: James L. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Meals
Represented By: Justin P. Lemaire
Represented By: Paul James Masinter
Represented By: Michael Q. Walshe, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas John Wehlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Non-Series N Shareholders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter M. Zayfert
Represented By: Joseph Aronauer
Represented By: Andy J. Dupre
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Anders F Holmgren
Represented By: John Re
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
Represented By: John C. Anjier
Represented By: James A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firefighters' Retirement System
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Municipal Employees Retirement System and New Orleans Firefighters' Pension & Relief Fund
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Charles M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: David M. Cheifetz
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: Stephen L. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?