Robinson et al v. City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge et al

Plaintiff: Demetra Parsons Robinson and George W Robinson, Jr.
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge, Laurie Nelson Marien, Steven Thomas Perret, Planning and Zoning Commission for the City of Baton Rouge, John Joseph Price and Martha Jane Tassin
Case Number: 3:2013cv00375
Filed: June 12, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2017 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 139 Motion for Taxation of Costs and Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 05/22/2017. (ELW)
October 28, 2016 122 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDMENT TO RULING AND ORDER re: 115 Order on Motion for Summary. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/28/2016. (LLH)
October 22, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Summary Judgment...IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in that the following of the Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE: (1) the substantive due process claim, (2) the procedural due process claim, and (3) the categorical takings (Lucas) claim; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the Defendants' motion is DENIED. Trial will proceed on the following claims: (1) the as applied (Penn Centra l) takings claim, (2) the Monell claim, and (3) the state law takings claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by Monday, October 24, 2016, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall file into the record trial briefs no longer than five pages addressing how this rul ing impacts the parties' currently pending motions in limine. The parties shall also inform the Court of which of their proposed jury instructions they wish to withdraw as no longer necessary. The parties are not entitled to file new motions in limine or seek the exclusion of additional evidence,and they are not entitled to submit new proposed jury instruction. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 10/22/2016. (KDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge
Represented By: Kristen Lundin Craig
Represented By: Sarah Shannahan Monsour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Nelson Marien
Represented By: Kristen Lundin Craig
Represented By: Sarah Shannahan Monsour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Thomas Perret
Represented By: Kristen Lundin Craig
Represented By: Sarah Shannahan Monsour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planning and Zoning Commission for the City of Baton Rouge
Represented By: Kristen Lundin Craig
Represented By: Sarah Shannahan Monsour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joseph Price
Represented By: Kristen Lundin Craig
Represented By: Sarah Shannahan Monsour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Jane Tassin
Represented By: Kristen Lundin Craig
Represented By: Sarah Shannahan Monsour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetra Parsons Robinson
Represented By: Frederick Scott Kaiser
Represented By: Steven Jay Levine
Represented By: Caroline H. Parenton
Represented By: Randy P. Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Frederick Scott Kaiser
Represented By: Steven Jay Levine
Represented By: Caroline H. Parenton
Represented By: Randy P. Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?