Monroe v. Poret et al

Plaintiff: Billy Monroe
Defendant: Cyndia Aquilina, James Cruze, Troy Poret and William Richardson
Interested Party: William Kline
Case Number: 3:2013cv00376
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting the 70 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiff's 56 Second Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED, and the Defendants' 49 Second Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED dismissing the Plaintiff's deliberate indifference to safety claim. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/11/2015. (LLH)
December 3, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Defendant's 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies is DENIED. The Plaintiff's 31 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; and this matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings as may be necessary. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/3/2014. (SMG)
April 28, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING adopting 27 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 25 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part, dismissing all of the Plaintiff's claims except the Plaintiff's claim that the Defendants were deliberately indiffer ent to his safety when they housed him in a cell with a known mentally ill inmate. This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings on the Plaintiff's deliberate indifference claim. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/28/2014. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Poret et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyndia Aquilina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cruze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Poret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William Kline
Represented By: William Lester Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?