Taylor v. The City of Baton Rouge et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Taylor
Defendant: Carl Dabadie, Jr., Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann and D. Dewayne White
Interested Party: Tedrick K. Knightshead and James L. Hilburn
Case Number: 3:2013cv00579
Filed: September 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: Considering the #118 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal; the above-captioned matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs. The #117 Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal and #102 Plaintiff's Motion to Submit Information Regarding Damages are DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/6/2016. (BLR)
May 6, 2016 Filing 118 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Ernest Taylor (Donahue, Terrence) Modified on 5/6/2016 to edit event and text (LLH).
April 29, 2016 Filing 117 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donahue, Terrence)
February 10, 2016 Filing 116 Minute Entry/ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Settlement Conference held on 2/10/2016. After a period of negotiations, the parties were able to agree upon proposed terms to settle all outstanding matters in the instant case. The parties will update the undersigned, as appropriate, regarding the status of obtaining approval for settlement. (LLH)
January 25, 2016 Filing 115 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 1/25/2016. The parties discussed the status of settlement negotiations in anticipation of settlement conference set for tomorrow. Settlement conference currently set for 1/26/2016 at 1:30 is RESCHEDULED for 2/10/2016 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for pltf to provide copy of latest offer & counteroffer to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. via facsimile on or before close of business on 2/9/16. Clerk of Court is directed to STRIKE record doc. 114 as it was filed in error. (JSL)
January 22, 2016 Filing 114 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Effort by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann, D. Dewayne White. (Gremillion, Frank)
January 13, 2016 Filing 113 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Settlement Conference held on 1/13/2016. A follow-up Settlement Conference is set for 1/26/2016 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. (NLT)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #111 MOTION for Leave to Waive Clients' Presence at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/14/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
December 10, 2015 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #111 MOTION for Leave to Waive Clients' Presence at Settlement Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
December 9, 2015 Filing 111 MOTION for Leave to Waive Clients' Presence at Settlement Conference by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann, D. Dewayne White. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Request for Waiver)(Gremillion, Frank)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 1/13/2016 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/30/2015. (BCL)
November 20, 2015 Filing 109 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Donahue, Terrence)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Christopher D. Glisson, Elliott C. Cassidy and Karl J. Koch is withdrawn as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/23/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
October 23, 2015 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #107 MOTION for Christopher D. Glisson, Elliott C. Cassidy and Karl J. Koch to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
October 22, 2015 Filing 107 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Ernest Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Koch, Karl) Modified on 10/23/2015 to edit text (ELW).
October 21, 2015 Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson: Status Conference held on 10/21/2015. The Motion to Enroll Terrence J. Donahue, Jr. as Additional Attorney (rec. doc. 105) is granted. Karl Koch and Christopher Glisson, counsel for the plaintiff, informed the Court that they will be filing a motion withdrawing as counsel for the plaintiff within the coming days. Current status of case is discussed. Counsel shall confer in an effort to reach a settlement in this matter. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report regarding settlement negotiations by 11/20/2015. If the parties are unable to negotiate a settlement, this matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Bourgeois for scheduling of a settlement conference. The pending Motion to Amend Complaint is discussed. Mr. Donahue, counsel for the plaintiff, informed the Court that is likely a Motion to Withdraw Motion to Amend Complaint will be filed. If desired, Plaintiff shall file the Motion to Withdraw Motion to Amend Complaint no later than 10/30/2015. The scheduling conference scheduled before Magistrate Judge Bourgeois on 10/29/2015 (15cv153) will be continued for 45 days. Separate order will issue regarding the setting of the scheduling conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
October 21, 2015 Filing 105 MOTION to Enroll Terrence J. Donahue, Jr. as Additional Attorney by Ernest Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Koch, Karl)
October 8, 2015 Filing 104 Notice to Counsel: Status Conference is set in this matter for 10/21/2015 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. All counsel shall be present for this conference.Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
September 30, 2015 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition to #102 MOTION to Submit Information Regarding Damages filed by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann, D. Dewayne White. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Gremillion, Frank)
September 21, 2015 Filing 102 MOTION to Submit Information Regarding Damages by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Sworn Declaration of Ernest Taylor)(Koch, Karl) Modified to edit text on 9/22/2015 (BCL).
September 21, 2015 Filing 101 Declaration of TERRENCE J. DONAHUE, JR. by All Plaintiffs. (Donahue, Terrence) Modified to edit text on 9/22/2015 (BCL).
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: Plaintiff shall, by motion, submit any information necessary to allow the Court "to make good the wrong done." Bell u. Hood, 327 U.S. 678, 684 (1946). Plaintiff's motion shall be filed no later than 9/21/2015. If Defendants wish to oppose Plaintiff's submission, they shall do so by motion no later than 10/1/2015. The Clerk of Court shall, by electronic means, serve Plaintiff's former counsel, Terrance J. Donahue, Jr., with a copy of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/14/2015. (LLH)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: Plaintiff shall, by motion, submit any information necessary to allow the Court "to make good the wrong done." See Bell v. Hood, 327 U.S. 678, 684 (1946). Plaintiffs motion shall be flied no later than 9/8/2015. If Defendants wish to oppose Plaintiffs submission, they shall do so by motion no later than 9/18/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/1/2015. (LLH). Modified on 9/1/2015 to attach document(LLH).
April 23, 2015 Filing 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson: Status Conference held on 4/23/2015. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record (Doc. 97). Defendants orally WITHDRAW their Rule 55(c) Motion to Set Aside Default (Doc. 77). All parties agree to permit all remaining claims in Case No. 13-cv-579-BAJ-RLB that do not arise under the Second Amendment to the U.S. Constitution will proceed as pled in the related case of 15-cv-153-BAJ-RLB. Accordingly, the only issue remaining in the instant suit is the issue of damages on the Second Amendment Claims. A schedule for discovery shall be set in accordance with Case No. 15-cv-153-BAJ-RLB. The cases shall remain separate, however, discovery shall occur simultaneously. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
April 22, 2015 Filing 97 MOTION to Substitute Counsel of Record by Ernest Taylor. (Glisson, Christopher) Modified to edit text on 4/23/2015 (BCL).
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting # 95 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tedrick K. Knightshead is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 04/17/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
April 16, 2015 MOTION(S) REFERRED: # 95 MOTION for Tedrick K. Knightshead to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
April 15, 2015 Filing 95 MOTION for Tedrick K. Knightshead to Withdraw as Attorney by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order)(Knightshead, Tedrick)
April 10, 2015 Filing 94 Notice to Counsel: The Pretrial Conference scheduled in this matter for 4/16/2015 is converted to a Status Conference. The Status Conference will be held in Chambers before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on APRIL 23, 2015 at 11:00 AM. ***NOTE SCHEDULING CHANGE OF DATE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
April 1, 2015 Filing 93 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Status Conference hearing before Judge Chief Brian A. Jackson held on 10-23-14. Court Reporter: Clare Smith-Neely. Phone Number: 225-389-3565.

< NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.lamd.uscourts.gov.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (Smith-Neely, Clare)
March 19, 2015 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ernest Taylor for proceedings held on 10/23/2014 before Judge Hon. Brian A. Jackson.. (Donahue, Terrence)
March 13, 2015 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by The City of Baton Rouge for proceedings held on 10/23/2014 before Judge Brian Jackson.. (Brown, Gwendolyn) Modified on 3/13/2015 Form forwarded to DG via email (LLH).
March 13, 2015 Filing 90 NOTICE of Related Proceedings by Ernest Taylor (Donahue, Terrence)
November 10, 2014 Filing 89 RESPONSE to # 88 Plaintiff's Memorandum filed by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Brown, Gwendolyn) Modified to edit text on 11/10/2014 (SMG).
November 3, 2014 Filing 88 Memorandum Regarding 87 October 23, 2014 Status Conference filed by All Plaintiffs. (Donahue, Terrence) Modified to edit text on 11/4/2014 (SMG).
October 23, 2014 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson: Status conference held on 10/23/2014 in Courtroom 2 re # 77 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Lisa Freeman, Carl Dabadie, Jr., Mary E. Roper, Jane Doe, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann, The City of Baton Rouge. As directed by the Court, Counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a Supplemental Memorandum on or before 11/3/2014. Defendants shall file their Response to the Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum by 11/10/2014. Briefs are limited to 5 pages in length. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 79 Motion to Continue Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(b)(2) Hearing and to Extend Time for Submission of Pre-Hearing Memoranda. The hearing set for 10/23/2014 is CANCELLED. The # 75 Plaintiff's Motion for Status Conference and # 78 Defendants' Motion to Join Plaintiff's Request for Status Conference is GRANTED. A Status Conference is set for 10/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 10/22/2014. (NLT)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting # 84 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Frank J. Gremillion entered into the record as additional counsel for defendants Carl Dabadie, Jr., Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas and Patrick Wennemann. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 10/22/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
October 17, 2014 MOTION(S) REFERRED: # 84 MOTION to Enroll Frank J. Gremillion as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
October 16, 2014 Filing 84 MOTION to Enroll Frank J. Gremillion as Additional Attorney by All Defendants. (Brown, Gwendolyn)
October 9, 2014 Filing 83 RESPONSE to # 77 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Hearing Transcript Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B - August 6 E-mail)(Donahue, Terrence)
October 7, 2014 Filing 82 Defendants' Pre-Hearing Memorandum Regarding Determination of Monetary Damages per # 69 Order filed by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Brown, Gwendolyn) Modified on 10/7/2014 to edit text (LLH).
September 23, 2014 Filing 81 Plaintiff's Pre-Hearing Memorandum Regarding Determination of Monetary Damages per # 69 Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Donahue, Terrence) Modified to edit text on 9/24/2014 (SMG).
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER... Considering the Parties Joint Motion to Continue Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b(2) Hearing and to Extend Time for Submission of pre-hearing memoranda (doc. 79); IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Extend Time for Submission of the parties pre-hearing memoranda is DENIED. The Parties Joint Motion to Continue Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)(2) Hearing is taken under advisement. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/23/2014. (PJH)
September 22, 2014 Filing 79 Joint MOTION to Continue Fed. Rule 55(b)(2) Hearing and to Extend Time for Submission of Pre-Hearing Memoranda by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donahue, Terrence) Modified on 9/23/2014 to edit text (CGP).
September 18, 2014 Filing 78 MOTION for Defendants to Join Plaintiff's Request for Status Conference by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Attachment Order)(Brown, Gwendolyn)
September 15, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 77 MOTION to Set Aside Default. (SMG)
September 15, 2014 Filing 77 FRCP Rule 55(C) MOTION to Set Aside Default by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Order)(SMG)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting # 74 MOTION for Leave to File FRCP Rule 55(C) Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Lisa Freeman, Carl Dabadie, Jr., Mary E. Roper, Jane Doe, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann, The City of Baton Rouge. Plaintiff shall file his memorandum in opposition to Defendants' FRCP Rule 55(c) Motion to Set Aside Default, if any, no later than 10/6/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/15/2014. (SMG) Modified to edit text on 9/15/2014 (SMG).
September 12, 2014 Filing 75 MOTION for Status Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donahue, Terrence)
September 11, 2014 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File FRCP Rule 55(C) Motion to Set Aside Default by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Motion for Leave Order, # 2 Attachment Rule 55C Motion, # 3 Attachment Rule 55C Order, # 4 Memorandum in Support)(Brown, Gwendolyn)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting # 71 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Gwendolyn K. Brown for Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas and Patrick Wennemann. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 9/3/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting # 70 Motion to Strike previously filed motion to enroll additional counsel (R. Doc. 68), and doc. 68 shall be Struck from the record of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 9/3/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
August 27, 2014 MOTION(S) REFERRED: # 71 MOTION to Enroll Gwendolyn K. Brown as Additional Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CGP)
August 27, 2014 MOTION(S) REFERRED: # 70 MOTION to Strike 68 MOTION to Enroll Gwendolyn K. Brown as Additional Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CGP)
August 26, 2014 Filing 71 MOTION to Enroll Gwendolyn K. Brown as Additional Attorney by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order)(Knightshead, Tedrick)
August 26, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION to Strike 68 MOTION to Enroll Gwendolyn K. Brown as Additional Attorney by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support)(Knightshead, Tedrick)
August 26, 2014 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 68 MOTION to Enroll Gwendolyn K. Brown as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JDL)
August 25, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry) Brief due by 9/23/2014. Brief due by 10/7/2014. Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. (NLT)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RULING AND ORDER: Plaintiff Ernest Taylor's # 26 Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED. The Court DECLARES that City of Baton Rouge, Louisiana and East Baton Rouge Parish, Louisiana Code of Ordinances 13:95.3 unlawfully infringes upon the right of Plaintiff and other citizens to keep and bear firearms, in violation of the Second Amendment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants the City of Baton Rouge, Carl Dabadie, Jr., Mary Roper, Lisa Freeman, Patrick Wennemann, James Thomas, and Jane Doe are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge Code of Ordinances 13:95.3. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to FRCP 56(b)(2), a HEARING shall be held on 10/23/2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2 to determine the amount of monetary damages due to Plaintiff Ernest Taylor. Taylor shall submit his pre-hearing memorandum no later than 09/23/2014. Defendants shall submit their memorandum in opposition, if any, no later than 10/7/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' # 61 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED AS MOOT. Final judgment shall issue by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/25/2014. (NLT)
August 22, 2014 Filing 68 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD MOTION to Enroll Gwendolyn K. Brown as Additional Attorney by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann, D. Dewayne White. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order)(Knightshead, Tedrick) Modified on 9/4/2014 to remove the document as it has been stricken (NLT).
August 13, 2014 NOTICE of Exhibits Filed Conventionally by The City of Baton Rouge re # 67 Order.(TMR)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting # 62 Motion to Strike Transcript Request, Motion to Withdraw James L. Hilburn as Attorney and # 37 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally. Counsel for the Defendants shall deliver a copy of the exhibits to the Clerk of Court no later than 08/14/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/13/2014. (NLT)
July 30, 2014 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/30/2014. Counsel presents oral argument to the Court. Mary Roper, Esq., Tedrick Knightshead, Esq. and James L. Hilburn, Esq. respond in open court to the Order to Show Cause issued herein. The Court advised counsel should they violate the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the Local Rules of the Middle District of Louisiana again, they may no longer be permitted to practice in this Court. For reaons stated, the Order to Show Cause as to Mary Roper, Esq., Tedrick Knightshed, Esq., and James L. Hilburn, Esq. is vacated. (Court Reporter C. Smith-Neely.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH) Modified on 8/12/2014 to edit text (PJH).
July 28, 2014 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson: Status Conference held on 7/28/2014. Procedural matters discussed. The Show Cause Hearing will be held, as previously scheduled, on 7/30/2014 at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 2. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
July 26, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Motion Hearing hearing before Judge Chief Brian A. Jackson held on 6-18-14. Court Reporter: Clare Smith-Neely. Phone Number: 225-389-3565. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.lamd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/13/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2014. (Smith-Neely, Clare)
July 25, 2014 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ernest Taylor for proceedings held on 06/18/14 before Judge Hon. Brian A. Jackson.. (Donahue, Terrence)
July 24, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION to Strike 58 Transcript Request by James L. Hilburn. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Hilburn, James) Modified on 7/25/2014 to indicate this request was also sent to Clare Smith -Neely via email (LLH).
July 24, 2014 Filing 61 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donahue, Terrence)
July 24, 2014 Filing 60 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Mary E. Roper for proceedings held on June 18, 2014 before Judge Brian A. Jackson.. (LeBlanc, Alfred)
July 23, 2014 Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James L. Hilburn for proceedings held on 06/18/2014 before Judge Brian A. Jackson.. (Hilburn, James) (Main Document 59 replaced on 7/24/2014) (LLH).
July 23, 2014 Filing 58 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by James L. Hilburn for proceedings held on 6/18/14 before Judge Jackson.. (Hilburn, James) Modified on 8/13/2014 to remove the document as it has been stricken (NLT).
July 23, 2014 Filing 57 RESPONSE to # 31 Order to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed filed by Mary E. Roper. (NLT)
July 23, 2014 Filing 56 RESPONSE to # 31 Order to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed filed by James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report)(NLT)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: The following motions are GRANTED: # 45 MOTION for Leave to File Response of James Hilburn and Tedrick Knightshead to the Court's Order to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed, # 49 MOTION for Leave to File response memorandum and # 53 MOTION for Status Conference. The # 48 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw/Strike Previously Filed Pleadings and Substitute Attached Pleadings for Same is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of Court shall STRIKE Document Numbers 42 and 43 and shall not substitute any documents for Doc Number 42. The following motions are DENIED AS MOOT: # 51 MOTION to Alter Judgment Appointing Counsel and MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Plaintiff's Response. Counsel for the plaintiff and all counsel for Mary E. Roper, James L. Hilburn and Tedrick K. Knightshead shall appear for a Status Conference on 7/28/2014 at 03:30 PM in chambers. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/23/2014. (NLT) Modified on 7/23/2014 to edit the text (NLT).
July 22, 2014 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Support of # 37 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally filed by All Plaintiffs. (Donahue, Terrence)
July 16, 2014 Filing 53 MOTION for Status Conference by Mary E. Roper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Alfred)
July 16, 2014 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to # 44 Response by Mary E. Roper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proposed order, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(LeBlanc, Alfred) Modified on 7/17/2014 to edit text (CGP).
July 14, 2014 Motions No Longer Referred: # 38 MOTION for James L. Hilburn to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USDJ per chambers. (NLT)
July 10, 2014 Filing 51 MOTION to Clarify # 47 Order Enrolling Additional Counsel by Mary E. Roper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Alfred) Modified on 7/11/2014 to edit text (CGP).
July 10, 2014 Filing 50 RESPONSE to # 36 Defendants' Post-Hearing Memorandum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Criminal Discovery, # 2 Exhibit B - Map of Events of October 13, 2012, # 3 Exhibit C - Boss Lady ATC Permit, # 4 Exhibit D - Romeo's ATC Permit, # 5 Exhibit E - WAFB News Release, # 6 Exhibit F - June 24th E-mail, # 7 Exhibit G - May 23rd E-mail, # 8 Exhibit H - Motion to Return Weapons)(Donahue, Terrence) (Attachment 8 replaced on 7/11/2014) (CGP). Modified on 7/11/2014 to edit text (CGP).
July 10, 2014 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Response of Mary Roper to # 31 Court's Order to Show Cause by Mary E. Roper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(LeBlanc, Alfred) Modified on 7/11/2014 to edit text(CGP).
July 9, 2014 Filing 48 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike 42 First MOTION for Leave to File a Response to the Rule to Show Cause , 43 Response And to Substitute Pleadings, by Mary E. Roper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit A-1, # 4 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit A-2)(LeBlanc, Alfred)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting # 41 and # 39 Ex Parte Motions to Enroll Additional Counsel. The Clerk of Court shall enroll Frank J. Gremillion, Shelton Dennis Blunt, and Paul LeBlanc in the above captioned matter for the sole purpose of representing James L. Hilburn, Tedrick Knightshead, and Mary E. Roper during the show cause hearing in this matter. (See Doc. 31). Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/07/2014. (CGP)
July 7, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry) Show Cause Hearing set for 7/30/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. (CGP)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: The Show Cause Hearing set for 07/08/2014 (see Doc. 31) is CONTINUED and RESET to 07/30/2014 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/07/2014. (CGP)
July 7, 2014 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Response of James Hilburn and Tedrick Knightshead to the Court's Order to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed by Tedrick K. Knightshead. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Response to Court's Order to Show Cause, # 2 Exhibit Status Report, # 3 Exhibit Order)(Gremillion, Frank)
July 7, 2014 Filing 44 RESPONSE to 42 First MOTION for Leave to File a Response to the Rule to Show Cause , 43 Response filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit B - May 2, 2014 E-mail, # 3 Exhibit C - Defendant's Initial Witness and Exhibit List, # 4 Exhibit D - June 16 E-mail, # 5 Exhibit E - June 25, 2014 Metro Council Administrative Matters Agenda)(Donahue, Terrence)
July 4, 2014 Filing 43 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD RESPONSE to the Court's Rule to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should not be Granted filed by Mary E. Roper. (Knightshead, Tedrick) Modified on 7/23/2014 to remove the document as it has been stricken (NLT).
July 4, 2014 Filing 42 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD First MOTION for Leave to File a Response to the Rule to Show Cause by Mary E. Roper. (Knightshead, Tedrick) Modified on 7/23/2014 to remove the document as it has been stricken (NLT).
July 4, 2014 Filing 41 First MOTION to Enroll Shelton Dennis Blunt and Paul LeBlanc as Additional Counsel of Record by Mary E. Roper. (Knightshead, Tedrick) Modified on 7/7/2014 to edit text (CGP).
July 3, 2014 Filing 40 Defense RESPONSE to Notice of Facts Related to Current Proceeding by The City of Baton Rouge (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Incident Report, # 2 Attachment ADSi CAD System Printout)(Knightshead, Tedrick) Modified on 7/7/2014 to edit text (CGP). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/7/2014) (CGP).
July 3, 2014 MOTION(S) REFERRED: # 39 Ex-parte MOTION to Enroll Frank J. Gremillion as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CGP)
July 3, 2014 MOTION(S) REFERRED: # 38 MOTION for James L. Hilburn to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CGP)
July 3, 2014 Filing 39 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Frank J. Gremillion as Attorney by James L. Hilburn, Tedrick K. Knightshead. (Gremillion, Frank) Modified on 7/3/2014 to edit text (CGP).
July 3, 2014 Filing 38 MOTION and ORDER for James L. Hilburn to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Hilburn, James) Modified on 7/3/2014 to edit text (CGP).
July 3, 2014 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally by The City of Baton Rouge. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order)(Knightshead, Tedrick)
July 2, 2014 Filing 36 POST HEARING MEMORANDUM by The City of Baton Rouge (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Misdemeanor Affidavit, # 2 Attachment Final Disposition Record, # 3 Attachment Motion and Order of Recusal, # 4 Attachment Recusal Order, # 5 Attachment Dismissal, # 6 Attachment 6-25-14 letter from Terrence Donahue, Jr.)(Knightshead, Tedrick) Modified on 7/3/2014 to edit text(CGP).
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall STRIKE 33 Post Trial Memorandum from the record in this matter. Defendants shall re-submit their memorandum, as previously ordered by this Court, no later than 7/3/2014 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/01/2014. (NLT)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Considering # 32 Notice of Facts Related to Current Proceedings filed by Ernest Taylor; counsel for the defendants shall submit a memorandum in response no later than 07/03/2014 at 5:00. Counsel shall attach a copy of the BRPD Incident Report to the memorandum in response. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/01/2014. (NLT)
June 30, 2014 Filing 33 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD POST HEARING MEMORANDUM by The City of Baton Rouge (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Attachment, # 4 Attachment)(Knightshead, Tedrick) Modified on 7/1/2014 to edit text (CGP). Modified on 7/1/2014 to remove the documents as they have been stricken(NLT).
June 27, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Facts Related to the Current Proceeding by Ernest Taylor (Donahue, Terrence)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: James L. Hilburn, Tedrick Knightshead and Mary E. Roper shall show cause on 07/08/2014 why the Court should not issue sanctions against counsel and/or Defendants due to counsels' failure to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana, and the orders of this Court. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/8/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/19/2014. (CGP)
June 19, 2014 Exhibit(s) filed conventially as to # 26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to City of Baton Rouge, Mary Roper, Carl Dabadie, Jr., Lisa Freeman, Patrick Wennemann, James Thomas by Ernest Taylor. (TMR)
June 18, 2014 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson: This matter came this day for oral argument on Defendants FRCP Rule55( c) Motion to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default (Doc. 22), Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Answer (Doc. 24), Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment(Doc. 26), and Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally (Doc. 27). Counsel presents oral argument to the Court. For reasons read into the record, the Court denies the Defendants FRCP Rule 55( c) Motion to Set Aside Clerks Entry of Default (Doc. 22). Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Answer (Doc. 24) and Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally (Doc. 27) are granted. The Court defers its ruling on Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. 26). Counsel for the Defendants shall file post hearing memorandum, no later than June 30, 2014, addressing the following: (1) the constitutionality of Baton Rouge Code 13:95.3 (2) their continued failure to return Ernest Taylors firearms to him, despitethe dismissal of all criminal charges against him. Counsel for the Plaintiff Ernest Taylor shall file a memorandum in response to the Defendants memorandum on or before July 10, 2014. For reasons stated on the record, the Court advised counsel for the Defendants that an Order to Show Cause may be issued this matter.(Court Reporter C. Smith-Neely.) (PJH)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Setting Hearing on # 27 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally, # 26 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment, # 24 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Answer and # 22 FRCP Rule 55(c) MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/02/2014. (CGP)
June 2, 2014 Motions No Longer Referred: # 27 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally . This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (CGP)
May 30, 2014 Filing 28 First RESPONSE in Opposition to # 26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to City of Baton Rouge, Mary Roper, Carl Dabadie, Jr., Lisa Freeman, Patrick Wennemann, James Thomas filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Knightshead, Tedrick)
May 30, 2014 MOTION(S) REFERRED: # 27 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CGP)
May 30, 2014 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donahue, Terrence)
May 30, 2014 Filing 26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to City of Baton Rouge, Mary Roper, Carl Dabadie, Jr., Lisa Freeman, Patrick Wennemann, James Thomas by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit B - Appearance Bond, # 3 Exhibit C - Motion to Quash, # 4 Exhibit D - Order Dismissing Charges, # 5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Terrence J. Donahue, Jr.)(Donahue, Terrence) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/30/2014) (CGP).
May 8, 2014 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition to # 24 MOTION to Strike 19 Answer to Complaint filed by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Knightshead, Tedrick)
May 3, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION to Strike 19 Answer to Complaint by Ernest Taylor. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donahue, Terrence)
May 3, 2014 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition to # 22 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Ernest Taylor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Donahue Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit B - USPS Documentation, # 3 Exhibit C - December 11, 2013 E-mail, # 4 Exhibit D - February 24, 2014 E-mail, # 5 Exhibit E - March 5, 2014 E-mail, # 6 Exhibit F - Motion to Quash)(Donahue, Terrence) (Attachment 6 replaced on 5/5/2014) (CGP).
April 22, 2014 Filing 22 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Knightshead, Tedrick)
April 22, 2014 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of # 22 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Knightshead, Tedrick) Modified to edit docket entry relationship on 4/22/2014 (SMG).
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting # 18 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney Tedrick Knightshead for Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, and for Patrick Wennemann. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/21/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
April 17, 2014 Filing 19 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD ANSWER to # 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann.(Knightshead, Tedrick) Modified on 6/23/2014 to remove the document as it has been stricken (NLT).
April 17, 2014 MOTION(S) REFERRED: # 18 MOTION to Enroll Tedrick K. Knightshead as Counsel of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CGP)
April 17, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION and ORDER to Enroll Tedrick K. Knightshead as Counsel of Record by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Hilburn, James) Modified on 4/17/2014 to edit text (CGP).
April 16, 2014 Filing 17 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann (CGP)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting # 13 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant D. DeWayne White. Plaintiff Ernest Taylor's claims against Defendant D. DeWayne White only are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 04/15/2014. (CGP)
April 16, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to The City of Baton Rouge, Mary E. Roper, Carl Dabadie, Jr., Lisa Freeman, Patrick Wennemann, and James Thomas by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donahue, Terrence)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Considering pltf's notice of voluntary dismissal of dft D. DeWayne White filed on 4/19/14, IT IS ORDERED that the show cause hrg set for 4/10/14 at 9:30 am is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/10/2014. (JSL) Modified on 4/10/2014 to edit the text (NLT).
April 9, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ernest Taylor (Donahue, Terrence) Modified on 4/11/2014 (CGP).
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's counsel, Terrence J. Donahue, Jr., shall personally appear before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. in Courtroom 6 on 4/10/2014 at 09:30 AM and SHOW CAUSE why claim against unserved dft should not be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 3/27/2014. (JSL)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, on 03/21/2014 why the claim against Defendant D. Dewayne White should not be dismissed under Local Rule 41.2.A for failure to prosecute where no service of process has been made within 120 days after filing of the complaint. Show Cause Response due by 3/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 03/06/2014. (CGP)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 3/6/2015 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2014. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 4/14/2014. Discovery due by 7/31/2014. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 9/2/2014. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 10/1/2014. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 9/2/2014. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 10/1/2014. Discovery from Experts due by 11/3/2014. Motions shall be filed by 12/1/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/23/2015. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 4/20/2015. Responses to Motions In Limine shall be filed by 5/11/2015. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 5/11/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2015 at 04:00 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 6/8/2015. A 5-day Jury Trial set for 6/22/2015-6/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 3/6/2014. (JSL)
March 5, 2014 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT - Supplement by Carl Dabadie, Jr, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, Ernest Taylor, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann. (Donahue, Terrence)
February 5, 2014 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2014 is reset to 3/6/2014 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. (JSL)
January 23, 2014 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Donahue, Terrence)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting # 5 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 12/19/2013 is continued and RESET for 2/6/2014 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. In addition, the deadline for filing the joint Status Report is RESET to 1/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 12/12/2013. (JSL)
December 5, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: # 5 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CGP)
December 5, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donahue, Terrence)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2013 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 12/5/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 10/31/2013. (JSL)
October 27, 2013 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ernest Taylor. Carl Dabadie, Jr waiver sent on 9/9/2013, answer due 11/8/2013; Lisa Freeman waiver sent on 9/9/2013, answer due 11/8/2013; Mary E. Roper waiver sent on 9/9/2013, answer due 11/8/2013; The City of Baton Rouge waiver sent on 9/9/2013, answer due 11/8/2013; James Thomas waiver sent on 9/9/2013, answer due 11/8/2013; Patrick Wennemann waiver sent on 9/9/2013, answer due 11/8/2013. (Donahue, Terrence)
September 5, 2013 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E. Roper, The City of Baton Rouge, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann, D. Dewayne White. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (CGP)
September 3, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Jury Trial against City of Baton Rouge/East Baton Rouge Parish, Carl Dabadie, Jr, Jane Doe, Lisa Freeman, Mary E Roper, James Thomas, Patrick Wennemann ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-988152.), filed by Ernest Taylor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - C, # 2 Signed Verification, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Donahue, Terrence) Modified on 9/5/2013 to edit text(CGP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. The City of Baton Rouge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Taylor
Represented By: Elliott Cade Cassidy
Represented By: Karl J. Koch
Represented By: Christopher D. Glisson
Represented By: Terrence J. Donahue, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Dabadie, Jr.
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Tedrick Knightshead
Represented By: James L. Hilburn
Represented By: Tedrick K. Knightshead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Tedrick Knightshead
Represented By: James L. Hilburn
Represented By: Tedrick K. Knightshead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Freeman
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Tedrick Knightshead
Represented By: James L. Hilburn
Represented By: Tedrick K. Knightshead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary E. Roper
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Tedrick Knightshead
Represented By: James L. Hilburn
Represented By: Tedrick K. Knightshead
Represented By: Alfred Paul LeBlanc, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Baton Rouge
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Tedrick Knightshead
Represented By: James L. Hilburn
Represented By: Tedrick K. Knightshead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thomas
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Tedrick Knightshead
Represented By: James L. Hilburn
Represented By: Tedrick K. Knightshead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Wennemann
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Represented By: Tedrick Knightshead
Represented By: James L. Hilburn
Represented By: Tedrick K. Knightshead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Dewayne White
Represented By: Gwendolyn K. Brown
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tedrick K. Knightshead
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: James L. Hilburn
Represented By: James L. Hilburn
Represented By: Frank J. Gremillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?