Scott v. E.I. duPont deNemours and Company

Defendant: E.I. duPont deNemours and Company
Plaintiff: Leo Scott, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00741
Filed: November 15, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2016 131 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Defendants Motion for Leave to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs Original Complaint and First Amended Complaint is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant shall file a comprehensive Answer and Affirmative Defenses comporting with this Ruling within ten (10) days of this Ruling due by 4/23/2016. Court grants Plaintiff leave to conduct additional discovery for a period of ninety (90) days on the issue of Defendants asserted legitimate, non-discriminatory, non-retaliatory reason for Plaintiffs termination due by 7/12/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/13/2016. (ELW)
November 24, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 51 Motion to Strike Dr. Paul Templet, Dr. Gerald Poje and Dr. Gary Miller as expert witnesses in the captioned matter. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/24/2015. (LLH)
September 4, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 44 Motion to Compel Discovery. Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(B), the plaintiff shall pay to the defendant, within 14 days, reasonable expenses in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/4/2015. (BCL)
April 29, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 7 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/28/2014. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. E.I. duPont deNemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. duPont deNemours and Company
Represented By: Lori A. Waters
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Jane H. Barney
Represented By: Smith Law FIrm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?