Terrebonne Parish NAACP et al v. Jindal et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Fuselier, Sr., Lionel Myers, Wendell Desmond Shelby, Jr., Terrebonne Parish Branch NAACP and Daniel Turner
Defendant: James D. Caldwell, Piyush Jindal and Tom Schedler
Case Number: 3:2014cv00069
Filed: February 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 RULING AND ORDER denying 436 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal; granting 438 Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/17/2020. (LT)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 416 RULING Adopting Plan 2 of the 396 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Special Master. The Court orders the Parties to jointly submit a proposed injunctive order for the implementation of remedial Plan 2. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/24/2019. (SWE)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 364 RULING denying 344 Motion for Reconsideration. This matter shall proceed to the remedy phase as set forth previously by the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/05/2018. (NLT)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 RULING denying 187 First MOTION for Leave to Intervene filed by Terrebonne Parish Consolidated Government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/11/2016. (ELW)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 RULING: The 81 Motion to Fix Expert Witness Discovery Fee and Time for Payment is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted in all respects except that the travel time costs submitted by Ronald Weber is reduced by $1,000. Plain tiffs shall pay the expert fees and expenses, as fixed by thisruling, for Michael Beychock ($2,750.00), Bruce L. Adelson ($7,000.00, and Ronald Weber ($4,707.64), within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/28/2015. (BCL)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 RULING granting 71 Motion For an Order Acknowledging That a Witness was Listed Timely by the State Defendants and/or For an Order Extending Deadline to Declare Expert Witnesses. Plaintiffs are granted leave to depose Romig and Hefner within 30 days, or such longer time as the parties may agree upon or as may be allowed by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/11/2015. (LLH)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 RULING: Caldwell's and Jindal's Motions to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) (Docs. 82 & 94) are DENIED. Additionally, having reviewed the complaint the Court finds that the defendants have not shown that a judgment on the merits can be rendered in their favor, and therefore their Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(c) (Doc. 85) is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/08/2015. (ELW)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 RULING granting 87 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Bruce L. Adelson. The Plaintiffs' 88 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael Beychok and 89 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Ronald E. Weber are DEFERRED until trial. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/18/2015. (LLH)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 RULING: The Defendants' 84 Motion to Strike Expert Report and 86 Motion to Conduct Daubert Hearing are DENIED. The parties shall have 60 days to conduct further expert discovery and depositions related to the supplemental reports. Additionally, both the Plaintiffs' 91 and Defendants' 93 Motions for Summary Judgment are DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/7/2015. (JDL)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RULING granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff Terrebonne Parish Branch NAACP shall serve another supplemental answer to Interrogatory No. 4, and a another supplemental response to Request for Production No. 6, wit hin 14 days. Also within 14 days, pursuant to Rule 37(b)(2), the plaintiffs shall pay to the defendant his reasonable expenses. The remaining aspects of the defendants motion are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 4/27/2015. (LLH)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RULING denying 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/18/2014. (SMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrebonne Parish NAACP et al v. Jindal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Caldwell
Represented By: Attorney General's Office - BR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piyush Jindal
Represented By: Attorney General's Office - BR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Schedler
Represented By: Celia R. Cangelosi
Represented By: Carey Thompson Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Fuselier, Sr.
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Ryan P. Haygood
Represented By: Natasha M. Korgaonkar
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Myers
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Ryan P. Haygood
Represented By: Natasha M. Korgaonkar
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Desmond Shelby, Jr.
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Ryan P. Haygood
Represented By: Natasha M. Korgaonkar
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrebonne Parish Branch NAACP
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Ryan P. Haygood
Represented By: Natasha M. Korgaonkar
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Turner
Represented By: Leah C. Aden
Represented By: Ryan P. Haygood
Represented By: Natasha M. Korgaonkar
Represented By: Deuel Ross
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?