DeOliveira v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Amy Langlois DeOliveira
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00240
Filed: April 22, 2014
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2014 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Langlois DeOliveira. Apple Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Aycock, Gregory)
April 23, 2014 Case Reassigned to Judge James J. Brady. Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JDL)
April 23, 2014 3 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SMG) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/25/2014) (SMG).
April 22, 2014 2 Summons Submitted (Aycock, Gregory)
April 22, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1069800.), filed by Amy Langlois DeOliveira. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Aycock, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeOliveira v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Langlois DeOliveira
Represented By: Gregory P. Aycock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Jerry L. Saporito
Represented By: Amanda W. Vonderhaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?