Burns v. East Baton Rouge Parish Prison Emergency Medical Services et al
Plaintiff: Steven Paul Burns
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Prison Emergency Medical Services, Unknown Leggio, Linda Ottesen and Unknown Williams
Case Number: 3:2014cv00245
Filed: April 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 OPINION Adopting the 185 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's 183 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied and the 154 Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Linda Ottesen is GRANTED, Dismissing claims against Defendant Ottesen, with prejudice, and this action be dismissed. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 9/21/2017. (LLH)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 OPINION Adopting 137 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge: The 78 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part, dismissing the Plaintiff's claims asserted against defendant Dachel Williams, with prejudice, dismissing the Plaintiff 's claims arising under the Americans With Disabilities Act, and dismissing the Plaintiff's claim for prospective injunctive relief. The Motion to Dismiss is otherwise denied and that this matter be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in connection with the Plaintiff's claim for monetary damages asserted against Linda Ottesen for the alleged violation of the Plaintiff's constitutional rights through deliberate indifference to his serious medical needs in September and October 2013. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 3/21/2016. (BLR)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying 84 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum, 85 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/19/2015. (LLH)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OPINION Adopting 75 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 40 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by defendants East Baton Rouge Parish Prison Medical Services, Linda Ottesen, and Dachel Williams is denied and this matter be referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 05/07/2015. (BCL)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RULING denying 74 Motion for Appointment of Court Appointed Expert Witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/17/2015. (LLH)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 OPINION adopting 57 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs 12 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and the 20 Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Vincent Leggio, DDS are denied withoutprejudice to the parties filing dispositive motions addressing the facts and claims asserted in the plaintiffs Verified Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 12/18/2014. (SMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. East Baton Rouge Parish Prison Emergency Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Paul Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Prison Emergency Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Leggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Ottesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?