Griffith v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gregory L. Griffith
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00470
Filed: July 29, 2014
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W. deGravelles
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 34 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's cause of action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/29/2016. (LLH)
December 18, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff must file its response, if any, to Defendant's 23 Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Discovery Order, on or before 12/23/2015. Any response filed by Plaintiff shall address whether the court apply the limitations that th e Motion represents were agreed upon by the parties regarding the scope of material to be provided in response to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents. If no response is filed, the Court will assume that the requested relief is unopposed. The Defendant's duty to respond to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents is stayed pending resolution of the Motion for Partial Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/18/2015. (LLH)
December 9, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Compel. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant within 7 days of the date of this Order. Any objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant shall be limited to any applicable privileges, immunities, or other protections from disclosure. Parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/9/2015. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Griffith
Represented By: David Anthony Binegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?