Houston Specialty Insurance Company v. Freightz Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company, Clinical Health Systems, Inc., DEF Insurance Company, Freightz Transportation, Inc., XYZ Insurance Company and YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00576
Filed: September 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RULING AND ORDER denying Houston Specialty Insurance Company's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting YRC Worldwide, Inc.'s 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/22/2016. (LLH)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER(Including Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates): In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2015. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 10/2/2015. Discovery due by 3/18/2016. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 2/18/2016. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 3/18/2016. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 2/18/2016. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 3/18/2016. Discovery from Experts due by 4/18/2016. Dispositive and Daubert Motions shall be filed by 5/2/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/2/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2016 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be f iled by 9/23/2016. Responses to Motions In Limine shall be filed by 10/14/2016. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 10/28/2016. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 11/25/2016. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2017 - 1/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. The scheduling conference set for 9/18/2015 is canceled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/11/2015. (LLH)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SUA SPONTE ORDER Setting Oral Argument for 21 Motion to Transfer. Hearing set for 7/16/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. At oral argument, Plaintiff's counsel must be prepared to discuss efforts to serve Defendant Clinical Health Systems, Inc. with the amended complaint in this matter, pursuant to the 10 telephone scheduling conference held on 1/29/2015 before the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/30/2015. (LLH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Specialty Insurance Company v. Freightz Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinical Health Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freightz Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Kaile Ann LeBlanc
Represented By: Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lauren Fajoni Bartlett
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?