Lewis et al v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: Otto Barrera, Clyde Carter, Ricky D. Davis, Cedric Evans, Reginald George, Edward Giovanni, Joseph Lewis, Jr., Kentrell Parker, Farrell Sampier, Lionel Tolbert, John Tonubbee and Rufus White
Defendant: Burl Cain, Stephanie Lamartiniere, James LeBlanc and The Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Unknown: Jeffrey Dubner
Case Number: 3:2015cv00318
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 587 RULING granting 581 Motion for Expedited Hearing on 580 Emergency Motion to Re-Open Discovery Regarding COVID-19. Plaintiffs' 580 Emergency Motion to Re-Open Discovery Regarding COVID-19 and 582 Emergency Motion to Restrain Defendants from Transferring COVID-19 Carriers to Louisiana State Penitentiary are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/2/2020. (SWE)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER: The 403 Motion for Reconsideration of 193 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' ADA Claims, 194 Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Eighth Amendment Claim is DENIED except as to exhaustion of administrative remedies. Plaintiff's Re-Urged 288 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/12/2018. (LLH)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER: Plaintiff's 417 MOTION to Exclude Evidence of Post-DiscoveryConditions is hereby GRANTED, and the 417 MOTION to Compel Additional Discovery is hereby DENIED. A bench trial on liability only, limited to evidence of the conditions as they existed on or before 9/30/2016 will go forward commencing on 10/9/2018. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/20/2018. (LLH)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 394 RULING granting 133 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 2/26/2018. (SGO)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 388 RULING granting 376 Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions. The Court will exclude any evidence or documents not produced in discovery unless such documents were attached to pleadings filed into the record prior to the class certification hearing. The Court declines to award any monetary sanctions. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/12/2018. (SGO)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 353 RULING granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 248 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/25/2017. (LLH)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 RULING : The 246 Motion in Limine is DENIED with full reservation of rights to urge objections at the time of trial. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/24/2017. (LLH)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 343 RULING granting 326 MOTION for Clarification of and Relief From 322 Ruling on 192 Motion to Exclude Testimony of David Thomas. The Courts' Prior 322 RULING is vacated in part . Plaintiff' s 192 Motion in Limine to exclude Dr. D avid Thomas' opinion testimony as relating to legal and security issues is GRANTED; the motion to exclude standard of care opinion testimony is DENIED, and all objections to admissibility are reserved. Defendants' request to vacate and amend the Scheduling Order and for leave to name a substitute expert is DENIED, as moot. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/23/2017. (LLH)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 322 RULING granting 192 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of David Thomas. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/29/2017. (SGO)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 RULING granting 191 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Jacqueline Moore. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/27/2017. (LLH)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER: Because the class certification issue must be decided before dispositive motions, and the Court believes that resolution of this issue may (or may not) alter the facts and /or analysis regarding the dispositive motions filed in this case, the Court will deny the 193 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs ADA Claims, 194 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment Claims, and the Defendants 261 Motion for Summary Judgment without preju dice. Following the class certification hearing, the Parties are granted leave of Court to re-urge these motions by reference to record document numbers, without the necessity of re-filing same. Should supplemental briefing be required based on the class certification determination, such leave is granted to file supplemental briefs not to exceed 15 pages without leave of Court. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/21/2017. (LLH)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 223 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/20/2017. (EDC)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 176 MOTION for Relief From Order Denying Joint Motion to Clarify Order. The Court's Order Denying as Moot the Joint Motion to Clarify Order on Second Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines for Submission of Opposing and Supplemental M emorandum in Regards to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification 175 is VACATED. The deadline for Plaintiff's submission of any supplemental memorandum in support of their Motion for Class Certification is extended to 12/19/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/15/2016. (EDC)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 152 Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/7/2016. (LLH)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is DENIED to the extent it seeks an award for costs pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5). In all other respects, the Motion to Compel is denied as moot. Because the Motion to Compel was granted in part and denied in part , and because the Court finds that Defendants' failure to meet the parties agreed upon deadlines was substantially justified and that awarding expenses under the circumstances would be unjust, each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 08/31/2016. (NLT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otto Barrera
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Carter
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky D. Davis
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Evans
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald George
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Giovanni
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lewis, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentrell Parker
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farrell Sampier
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Tolbert
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tonubbee
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus White
Represented By: Elizabeth Claire O'K Compa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jeffrey Dubner
Represented By: Mercedes Hardy Montagnes
Represented By: Candice C. Sirmon
Represented By: Miranda Tait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Lamartiniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?