Thomas v. Gullotta et al
Plaintiff: |
Maurice Thomas |
Defendant: |
Orian Gullotta, John Little, City Of Plaquemine, Unknown Liability Insurance Carriers of All Defendants, Unknown Police Deputy 1, Unknown Police Deputy 2, Unknown Police Deputy 3 and Unknown Police Deputy 4 |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00435 |
Filed: |
July 3, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Baton Rouge Office |
Presiding Judge: |
James J. Brady |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard L. Bourgeois |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 9, 2018 |
Filing
85
RULING: The 81 Motion for Reconsideration filed on behalf of Defendants, Plaquemine Police Chief Orian Gulotta, the City of Plaquemine, and Plaquemine Police Officer John Little, in his individual capacity is hereby granted. Plaintiff Thomas Gulotta's 42 U.S.C. § 1983 individual capacity claim against Officer Little for false arrest/false imprisonment under the Fourth/Fourteenth Amendments and state law claim of false imprisonment arising out of Thomas' March 9, 2015 a rrest for resisting an officer are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's state law claims of respondeat superior and vicarious liability against the City of Plaquemine and Plaquemine Police Chief Orian Gulotta based upon Thomas' March 9, 2015 arrest for resisting an officer, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/9/2018. (KAH)
|
June 7, 2018 |
Filing
78
RULING granting 72 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against the Unknown Defendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 41(b) due to his failure to effectuate timely service against them pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/7/2018. (KAH)
|
January 26, 2017 |
Filing
64
RULING granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Orian Gullotta, City Of Plaquemine, and granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Dismiss filed by John Little. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/25/2017. (LLH)
|
July 6, 2016 |
Filing
47
RULING: The Defendant's 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 07/06/2016. (ELW)
|
March 17, 2016 |
Filing
32
RULING Adopting the 31 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 28 Motion to Reopen Case is GRANTED and the Court's 25 RULING and 26 Judgment are VACATED, and this action is REINSTATED on the Court's Docket. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/16/2016. (LLH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?