Hall v. Louisiana Workforce Commission et al

Plaintiff: Lakeisha Hall
Defendant: Wes Hataway, Louisiana Workforce Commission and Bryce Tomlin
Case Number: 3:2015cv00533
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2018 88 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: The 67 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed as listed. Defendant, Corey Gaines, is DISMISSED from this action. The parties may file any motions for summary judgment within 21 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/8/2018. (LLH)
November 9, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file simultaneous supplemental briefing not to exceed 5 pages within 10 days of this Order on whether Plaintiffs § 1983 discrimination claims against Hataway, Blount, Gaines, and Tomlin are barred by the statute of limitations because Plaintiffs original Complaint was filed outside the one year statute of limitations for a § 1983 claim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/9/2017. (LLH)
April 29, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: Defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(l) and 12(b)(6) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's FMLA claim, Title VII disparate impact claim, and request for punitive damages against the Louisiana Workforce Commission; Plaintiff's § 1983 claim for violation of the FMLA against Wes Hataway, Bryce Tomlin, and Nakesla Blount; and Plaintiff's § 1983 claim for intentional employment discrim ination against Wes Hataway and Nakesla Blount. It is DENIED as to Plaintiff's § 1983 claim for intentional employment discrimination against Bryce Tomlin. Plaintiff's claims against Louisiana Workforce Commission, pursuant to the ADA, FMLA, Title VII disparate impact, La. R.S. § 23:301 et seq., La. R.S. § 23:967, and La. R. S. § 23:314, as well as punitive damages, are DISMISSED. Plaintiff's claims against Bryce Tomlin, in his individual and official capacity, pursuant to the ADA, and in his individual capacity, pursuant to § 1983 for violation of the FMLA, are DISMISSED. Plaintiff's claims against Wes Hataway, in his individual capacity, pursuant to § 1983 for violation of the FMLA and intentional employment discrimination, are DISMISSED. Defendant, Nakesla Blount, is DISMISSED from this action. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/29/2016. (BLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Louisiana Workforce Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeisha Hall
Represented By: Azelie Ziegler Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Hataway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Workforce Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?