Rodgers v. State of Louisiana Board of Nursing
Plaintiff: Kourtney S Rodgers
Defendant: State of Louisiana Board of Nursing
Case Number: 3:2015cv00615
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1337 Sherman-Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RULING denying Rogers' 36 Motion for Reconsideration and granting the defendant's 21 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/18/2015. (LLH)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RULING AND ORDER: After the defendant moved to strike the Opposition, Rodgers filed a Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits. Having stricken the Opposition from the record for the reasons stated above, the plaintiff's 33 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits is MOOT. The 29 Opposition violated this Court's Briefing Notice because it was untimely and exceeded the page limit. Accordingly, the Defendant's 30 Motion to Strike Document 29 from the Record is GRANTED, and the Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Leave is MOOT. The non-complying 29 opposition is hereby STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/26/2015. (BCL)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULING re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by State of Louisiana Board of Nursing. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/10/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 9/11/2015.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. State of Louisiana Board of Nursing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana Board of Nursing
Represented By: Kathryn Dufrene
Represented By: Carrie LeBlanc Jones
Represented By: Mary E. Roper
Represented By: Edmond Wade Shows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kourtney S Rodgers
Represented By: Dianne Lorraine Hill
Represented By: William T. Hughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?