Baker v. Ephia

Plaintiff: Sede Baker
Defendant: Unknown Ephia
Case Number: 3:2015cv00838
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RULING AND ORDER granting 153 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/29/2019. (NLT)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RULING and ORDER denying 70 and 124 Motions for Summary Judgment, 98 and 123 Motions to Dismiss, and 126 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/19/2018. (SGO)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 99 Motion to Stay Discovery. The parties are to contact the undersigned within 7 days of the district judge's ruling on the pendiong 98 motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/11/2017. (SGO)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 82 Second Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/31/2017. (LLH)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 71 Motion to Stay Discovery, and denying 76 MOTION for Leave to File leave to file Sur-Opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/17/2017. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Ephia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sede Baker
Represented By: Donna Unkel Grodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ephia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?