Porter v. Time Group et al

Plaintiff: Joel G. Porter
Defendant: Steve Helling, Anne Lang, Time Books and Times Group
Case Number: 3:2016cv00121
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order Adopting the 48 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 34 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The entry of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint into the record, will destroy diversity jurisdiction in this action,and the Court REMANDS this action to the 19th Judicial District Court, East Baton Rouge Parish, Louisiana. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/14/2017. (LLH)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RULING Adopting the 23 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 6 Motion to Remand is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/18/2016. (LLH)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 27 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Ann Lang Representative, without prejudice to refile within 7 days of this Order. Defendants are ORDERED to file any response, if any, within 7 days of Plaintiff's filing. To th e extent Plaintiff wishes to substitute Ms. Lang's estate or succession in place of Ms. Lang, his Motion for Leave is DENIED, as Ms. Langs succession or estate is not a proper party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/11/2016. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Time Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Helling
Represented By: W. Scott Keaty
Represented By: Joshua Gregory McDiarmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Books
Represented By: W. Scott Keaty
Represented By: Joshua Gregory McDiarmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Times Group
Represented By: W. Scott Keaty
Represented By: Joshua Gregory McDiarmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel G. Porter
Represented By: Elton Heron
Represented By: Charlotte McDaniel McGehee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?