J.A.H. Enterprises, Inc. v. BLH Equipment, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: |
J.A.H. Enterprises, Inc. |
Defendant: |
BLH Equipment, L.L.C., ELA Mission, L.L.C., James Blake Everett, MS and Sam Everett, MS |
Counter Claimant: |
BLH Equipment, L.L.C., ELA Mission, L.L.C. and James Blake Everett |
Counter Defendant: |
J.A.H. Enterprises, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00124 |
Filed: |
February 25, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Baton Rouge Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Shelly D. Dick |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard L. Bourgeois |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
97
ORDER : The 86 SEALED MOTION to Compel production of documents is DENIED as moot. The 87 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as written. Defendants shall provide supplemental responses to Request for Production Nos. 1, 7, 8, 10 and 12, as detailed in the body of this Order, within 10 days of the date of this Order. Parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/12/2017. (LLH)
|
January 4, 2017 |
Filing
81
RULING denying 60 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/4/2017. (LLH)
|
November 30, 2016 |
Filing
79
RULING Adopting 75 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 56 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED, and the claims against Nick Clark are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/30/2016. (NLT)
|
October 31, 2016 |
Filing
76
RULING Adopting Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Motions 5 MOTION to Dismiss AND 33 MOTION to Dismiss are DENIED. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/31/2016. (ELW)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: J.A.H. Enterprises, Inc. v. BLH Equipment, L.L.C. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter claimant: BLH Equipment, L.L.C. |
Represented By: |
Wesley Joseph Levesque |
Represented By: |
Richard A. Richardson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter claimant: ELA Mission, L.L.C. |
Represented By: |
Wesley Joseph Levesque |
Represented By: |
Richard A. Richardson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter claimant: James Blake Everett |
Represented By: |
Wesley Joseph Levesque |
Represented By: |
Richard A. Richardson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: BLH Equipment, L.L.C. |
Represented By: |
Wesley Joseph Levesque |
Represented By: |
Richard A. Richardson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: ELA Mission, L.L.C. |
Represented By: |
Wesley Joseph Levesque |
Represented By: |
Richard A. Richardson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: James Blake Everett, MS |
Represented By: |
Wesley Joseph Levesque |
Represented By: |
Richard A. Richardson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Sam Everett, MS |
Represented By: |
Wesley Joseph Levesque |
Represented By: |
Richard A. Richardson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter defendant: J.A.H. Enterprises, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Layrisson |
Represented By: |
Stephen O'Brien Scandurro |
Represented By: |
Timothy D. Scandurro |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: J.A.H. Enterprises, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Layrisson |
Represented By: |
Stephen O'Brien Scandurro |
Represented By: |
Timothy D. Scandurro |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?