K&F Restaurant Holdings, Ltd. et al v. Rouse et al
Plaintiff: Osvaldo Fernandez, G&O Pizza Holdings, Ltd., G&O Restaurant Operations, LLC, K&F Restaurant Holdings, Ltd., K&F Restaurant Operations, LLC and A. Gary Kovacs
Defendant: Donald J. Rouse, Jr., Donald J. Rouse, Sr., Thomas B. Rouse, Allison Rouse Royster and Rouse's Enterprises, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00293
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Presiding Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 RULING AND ORDER granting 139 Motion to Dismiss; granting 140 Motion to Dismiss; granting 143 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and granting 148 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court will enter judgment consistent with this Ruling and Order. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 07/24/2018. (KDC)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 RULING AND ORDER denying 141 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/9/2018. (SGO)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 RULING granting 118 Motion for Recusal ; denying as moot 131 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 09/21/2017. (ELW)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 RULING: Motion for New Trial / Reconsideration 41 is DENIED. Motion for Oral Argument 42 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/26/2017. (ELW)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RULING denying 39 MOTION for Recusal OF DISTRICT JUDGE SHELLY D. DICK UNDER RULE 28 U.S.C.A. § 144 and 40 MOTION for Recusal OF DISTRICT JUDGE SHELLY D. DICK UNDER RULE 28 U.S.C.A. § 455. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/27/2017. (LLH)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 46 First Amended Complaint shall be STRICKEN from the record. Plaintiffs shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Notice and Order to file a comprehensive amended complaint without further leave of court. D efendants shall have twenty-one (21) days from the filing of the comprehensive amended complaint to file responsive pleadings. The 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 46 Amended Complaint, and 50 MOTION for Expedited Hearing are TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/23/2017. (LLH)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Motion to Dismiss 5 for Failure to State a Claim granting in part and denying in part. Motion for Oral Argument 6 is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 02/02/2017. (ELW)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RULING Adopting 25 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 7 Motion to Remand is DENIED. The 8 Motion for Oral Argument is DENIED as moot and this matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/22/2016. (SGO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K&F Restaurant Holdings, Ltd. et al v. Rouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osvaldo Fernandez
Represented By: Evans Law, APLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&O Pizza Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: Evans Law, APLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&O Restaurant Operations, LLC
Represented By: Evans Law, APLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K&F Restaurant Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: Evans Law, APLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K&F Restaurant Operations, LLC
Represented By: Evans Law, APLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Gary Kovacs
Represented By: Evans Law, APLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Rouse, Jr.
Represented By: Brent B. Barriere
Represented By: Molly Louise Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Rouse, Sr.
Represented By: Brent B. Barriere
Represented By: Molly Louise Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B. Rouse
Represented By: Brent B. Barriere
Represented By: Molly Louise Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Rouse Royster
Represented By: Brent B. Barriere
Represented By: Molly Louise Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rouse's Enterprises, L.L.C.
Represented By: Brent B. Barriere
Represented By: Molly Louise Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?