Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. v. Samson Exploration, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff: |
Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. |
ThirdParty Defendant: |
Samson Exploration, LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00437 |
Filed: |
June 28, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Baton Rouge Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian A. Jackson |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard L. Bourgeois |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1452 Removal of Claim in Civil Action Related to BK. Case |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 20, 2017 |
Filing
39
AMENDED RULING AND ORDER Adopting 30 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 4 Motion to Remand is GRANTED and this action is REMANDED to the 18th JDC, Parish of Iberville. The MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION to Stay is Denied as Moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 01/19/2017. A certified copy of this order was mailed to appropriate judicial district court) (EDC) (Main Document 39 replaced on 1/20/2017) (EDC). Modified on 1/20/2017 to edit text. (EDC).
|
January 19, 2017 |
Filing
38
RULING AND ORDER Adopting 30 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 4 Motion to Remand is GRANTED and this action is REMANDED to the 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge. The MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION to Stay is Denied as Moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 01/19/2017. (NLT)(A certified copy of this order was mailed to appropriate judicial district court)
|
August 8, 2016 |
Filing
15
ORDER and RULING granting 8 Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/4/2016. (LLH)
|
August 5, 2016 |
Filing
12
ORDER AND RULING granting 6 Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Exhibit. The Clerk of Court shall substitute Document 5-4 with Document 6-1. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/4/2016. (LLH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. v. Samson Exploration, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty plaintiff: Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. |
Represented By: |
Vance A. Gibbs |
Represented By: |
Hattie Vaughn Guidry |
Represented By: |
Esteban Herrera, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Kean, Miller, Hawthorne, D'Armond, McCowan & Jarman |
Represented By: |
Samuel O'Neill Lumpkin |
Represented By: |
Richard Dean McConnell, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Victor Jacob Suane, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty defendant: Samson Exploration, LLC |
Represented By: |
Nancy Scott Degan |
Represented By: |
Stephanie Noriea Murphy |
Represented By: |
Adam B. Zuckerman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?