Road Sprinkler Fitters Local Union No. 669, U.A., AFL-CIO v. CCR Fire Protection, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Road Sprinkler Fitters Local Union No. 669, U.A., AFL-CIO
Defendant: Earl Barnett, Rajendra Bhakta, CCR Fire Protection, LLC, Nilesh Patel, Quick Response Fire Protection, Roseal Rodriguez, Jr. and Theresa Rodriguez
Case Number: 3:2016cv00448
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W. deGravelles
Presiding Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: Plaintiff Road Sprinkler Fitters, Local Union No. 669, U.A., AFL-CIO demands specific performance of what it contends to be a binding contract settling a labor dispute between it and CCR Fire Protection, LLC. This matter was tried to the Court on May 14-15, 2019. The parties submitted The Court has reviewed and considered the briefs and arguments of counsel. the Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to prove its entitlement to the relief sought. Therefor e, judgment is rendered in favor of defendants CCR Fire Protection, LLC and Quick Response Fire Protection, LLC and against Plaintiff Road Sprinkler Fitters, Local Union No. 669, U.A., AFL-CIO, dismissing its claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 09/27/2019. (ELW)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 RULING and ORDER denying 106 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 116 117 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/21/2018. (EDC)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RULING AND ORDER granting 55 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claims against Barnett are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/25/2017. (SGO)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RULING AND ORDER granting in part 24 Motion to Dismiss. The claims against Bhatka in Plaintiff's 54 Substituted Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff be granted leave to file within thirty (30) days of this Ruling an Amended Complaint to allege, if he can, factual allegations to supportjurisdiction of Rajendra Bhatka in his individual capacity. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/5/2017. (SGO)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RULING AND ORDER granting in part 37 Motion for Leave of Court to File Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall substitute an Amended Complaint for the proposed First Amended Complaint that removes any allegations with regard to Earl Bar nett that are revised from those allegations against Barnett contained in the original Complaint. Further leave of court is not necessary for Plaintiff to file a substituted First Amended Complaint. The 20 Motion to Dismiss, filed by defendants Rose al Rodriguez and Theresa Rodriguez, and the 21 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) of Defendants Quick Response Fire Protection, LLC, and Earl Barnett are TERMINATED without prejudice to any party re-filing a Motion to Dismiss that addresses the allegations contained in the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/23/2017. (SGO) Modified to edit text on 1/23/2017 (SGO).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Road Sprinkler Fitters Local Union No. 669, U.A., AFL-CIO v. CCR Fire Protection, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajendra Bhakta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCR Fire Protection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilesh Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick Response Fire Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseal Rodriguez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Road Sprinkler Fitters Local Union No. 669, U.A., AFL-CIO
Represented By: Christina L. Carroll
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?