AmeriHealth Caritas Louisiana, Inc. v. Promise Hospital of Ascension, Inc.

Plaintiff: AmeriHealth Caritas Louisiana, Inc.
Defendant: Promise Hospital of Ascension, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00484
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W. deGravelles
Presiding Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment, in favor of AmeriHealth Caritas and against Promise Hospital of Ascension, Inc., in the amount of $936,777.31, plus pre- and post- judgment interest. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 03/16/2018. (KDC)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Compel and granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. The Non-Expert Discovery is extended to 11/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/13/2017. (LLH)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines; granting 14 Motion for Expedited Consideration of Consent Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines Discovery due by 9/20/2017. Plaintiff` ;s Expert Witness List due by 8/24/2017. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 9/22/2017. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 10/20/2017. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 11/22/2017. Discovery from Experts due by 12/15/2017. Dispositive and Daubert Motions shall be filed by 1/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 05/15/2017. (ELW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AmeriHealth Caritas Louisiana, Inc. v. Promise Hospital of Ascension, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AmeriHealth Caritas Louisiana, Inc.
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Patrick Lawrence McCune
Represented By: Robert Lewis Rieger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Promise Hospital of Ascension, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?