Scheppf v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Paul Dan Scheppf
Defendant: Diana Rosa Baku, Tennessee Coalition to End Domestic Violence, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2016cv00575
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W. deGravelles
Presiding Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION Adopting 40 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The remaining claims of Plaintiff against Diana Rose Baku, shall be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Reinstatement of this action within thirty days may be permitted upon a showing of good cause by the Plaintiff. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/28/2018. (KAH)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RULING AND ORDER granting 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by U.S. Attorney General. Any claims against theDepartment of Justice, the Department of State, or any other federal entity named as a defendantor mentioned in the Amended Complaint are also dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 2/9/2018. (LLH)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RULING AND ORDER granting 32 Motion to Strike, Defendant Tennessee Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, without prejudice. The 18 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), and 12(b)(6) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 6/15/2017. (LLH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scheppf v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Rosa Baku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Coalition to End Domestic Violence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dan Scheppf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?