Leo et al v. Jeld-Wen, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kathleen Leo and Ronald Leo
Defendant: Jeld-Wen, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00605
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Presiding Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER: Plaintiffs' 99 MOTION for Review is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs amend their Bill of Costs with a separate memorandum or affidavit in compliance with local and federal rules by 3/3/2020. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/18/2020. (SWE)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RULING AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 84 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and, Alternatively, Motion for New Trial, 83 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and Defendant's 81 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial and/or Remittitur. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/16/2019. (SWE)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RULING AND ORDER denying 16 Motion to Exclude the Reports, Opinions and Testimony of Lee R. Connel and 46 Motion in Limine to Exclude Videos and Videography. The 47 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Testimony of Settlement from Trial is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/7/2018. (SGO)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RULING AND ORDER: Defendant's 14 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Redhibition Claims is DENIED. Plaintiff's 18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Declaring Condition to be a Redhibitory Defect is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/11/2018. (KAH)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RULING AND ORDER denying 33 Motion in Limine to Exclude Extracted Windows and Any Testimony Regarding Extracted Windows at Trial. Discovery in this case shall be reopened for thirty days for the limited purpose of examining the removed windows and the evidence relating to it. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/10/2018. (SGO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leo et al v. Jeld-Wen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeld-Wen, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor C Davies
Represented By: Kathryn Theriot Trew
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Leo
Represented By: Scott E. Frazier
Represented By: Jacob B Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Leo
Represented By: Scott E. Frazier
Represented By: Jacob B Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?