Williams v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rockett Williams
Defendant: Bridgestone Bandag, LLC, Southern Tire Mart, L.L.C. and United Parcel Service, Inc.
Notice Only: Richard L. Bonnafons and Leo Caillier, III
Case Number: 3:2017cv00483
Filed: July 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RULING denying 44 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; however, Plaintiff's claims against USP are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/20/2018. (SWE) Modified on 12/20/2018 to replace document per chambers (SWE).
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RULING granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/7/2018. (SGO)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: On or before 10/11/2017, the removing defendant shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of defendants Southern Tire Mart, LLC and Bridgestone Bandag, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/27/2017. (LLH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: Richard L. Bonnafons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: Leo Caillier, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Bandag, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Tire Mart, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannon C. Burr
Represented By: Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
Represented By: Lewis Brisbois
Represented By: Meredith A. Mayberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Louis Bonnaffons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockett Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?