Petrin, LLC v. Dun & Bradstreet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Petrin, LLC |
Defendant: |
Dun & Bradstreet, Inc. and Supplier |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv01095 |
Filed: |
October 12, 2017 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Baton Rouge Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Shelly D. Dick |
Presiding Judge: |
Erin Wilder-Doomes |
Nature of Suit: |
Assault Libel & Slander |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 30, 2017 |
Filing
6
NOTICE AND ORDER: The 5 Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery and for Extension of Time is GRANTED. D&B is given an extension of thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to comply with this Court's 4 10/23/2017 Notice and Order. After the expiration of the 30 day limited jurisdictional discovery period, D&B shall file a Motion to Substitute the 1 Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Notice of Removal that properly alleges the citizenship of Petrin, LLC and shall separately file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning subject matter jurisdiction, specifically whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. § 1332 is met. Plaintiff shall file either: (1) a memorandum and suppor ting evidence concerning the court's subject matter jurisdiction, specifically, whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. § 1332 is met; or (2) a Motion to Remand, within ten (10) days after the filing of D&B's memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/30/2017. (LLH)
|
October 23, 2017 |
Filing
4
NOTICE AND ORDER: Dun & Bradstreet, Inc. shall file a Motion to Substitute the 1 Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Notice of Removal that properly alleges the citizenship of Petrin, LLC. D&B shall have seven (7) days from the date of this N otice and Order to file the Motion to Substitute. D&B shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning subject matter jurisdiction, specifically whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. § 1332 is met, within ten (10 ) days of this Notice and Order. Plaintiff shall file either: (1) a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning the courts subject matter jurisdiction, specifically, whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. § 1332 is met; or (2) a Motion to Remand, within ten (10) days after the filing of the D&Bs memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/20/2017. (LLH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?