Palmerv. H&E Equipment Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Palmer and Amherst Madison, Inc.
Defendant: H&E Equipment Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00688
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Filing 16 Notice to Counsel: In light of Attorney Matthew Paul Skrabanek being admitted to practice in this court, the Show Cause Hearing set for 8/27/2018 is CANCELED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 20, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Amherst Madison, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Plunkett, Lawrence) Modified on 8/21/2018 to edit text (LLH).
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H&E Equipment Services, LLC. (Pusateri, Salvador)
August 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipt Returned on Paul Skrabanek on August 13, 2018 re #12 Order to Show Cause. (EDC)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER : Plaintiff's counsel, Paul Skrabanek , shall personally appear at a Show Cause Hearing set for 8/27/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes and SHOW CAUSE for failure to comply with the court's #9 NOTICE AND ORDER. Paul Skrabanek, shall complete the attorney admission packet located on the Court's website as previously instructed in the 7/16/2018 Letter from the court by 8/16/2018, in lieu of appearing for the above show cause hearing. The Clerk's Office shall serve this Order to Paul Skrabanek via certified mail return receipt requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/9/2018. Certified Mail Receipt 7004 1160 0003 2648 1562. (LLH)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE AND ORDER: Defendant, Amherst Madison, Inc., shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning subject matter jurisdiction within ten (10) days of the date of this Notice and Order as written. Plaintiff shall either file a memorandum and supporting evidence regarding subject matter jurisdiction, or a Motion to Remand for lack of subject matter jurisdiction within ten (10) days after the filing of Defendants memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/9/2018. (LLH)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2018 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/31/2018. (SWE) Main Document 10 replaced on 8/8/2018 to correct attachment A (BLR).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER: No later than seven (7) days from this notice and order, Paul Skrabanek, counsel for the plaintiff, shall complete the attorney admission packet located on the Court's website as previously instructed in the July 16, 2018, #3 Letter, correspondence from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/30/2018. (BLR)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Marva Jo Wyatt for Amherst Madison, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/30/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 23, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Enroll Marva Jo Wyatt as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Enroll Marva Jo Wyatt as Additional Attorney by Amherst Madison, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Plunkett, Lawrence)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by H&E Equipment Services, LLC.(Pusateri, Salvador)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amherst Madison, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Port Amherst, Ltd. for Amherst Madison, Inc... (Plunkett, Lawrence)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Amherst Madison, Inc..(Plunkett, Lawrence)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Paul Skrabanek who is lead counsel for party Derrick Palmer. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LLH)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Consent to Removal by Amherst Madison, Inc.. (Plunkett, Lawrence)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-670240. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1793989), filed by Amherst Madison, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Cover Sheet)(Plunkett, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmerv. H&E Equipment Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Palmer
Represented By: Matthew Paul Skrabanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amherst Madison, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence R. Plunkett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&E Equipment Services, LLC
Represented By: Salvador Joseph Pusateri
Represented By: Elizabeth Belle McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?