H&E Equipment Services, Inc. v. URS Corporation Architecture PC
Plaintiff: H&E Equipment Services, Inc.
Defendant: URS Corporation, Thomas E. Ryan, II, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C. and L O'Neal Johnson
Case Number: 3:2018cv00690
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
2 Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Filing 34 SUR-REPLY to #25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SWE) Modified on 8/23/2018 to add docket association (SWE).
August 23, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY in Support of #10 MOTION to Remand filed by H&E Equipment Services, Inc. (SWE) #1 Attachment). Modified on 8/23/2018 to add attachment(SWE).
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C. The Sur-Reply [30-1] and attachments shall be filed. No further briefing will be permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/23/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand filed by H&E Equipment Services, Inc. The Reply [29-2] and attachment shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/23/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
August 22, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #30 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 21, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Proposed Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Proposed Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Anada, Tarak)
August 20, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand by H&E Equipment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit)(Mince, Loretta)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 MOTION to Substitute Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C. The Memorandum in Opposition (R. Doc. 25) shall be substituted with the corrected Memorandum in Opposition (R. Doc. 27-1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
August 13, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #27 MOTION to Substitute Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
August 13, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Substitute Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Substituted Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Anada, Tarak)
August 13, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to #25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Strike the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (SWE)
August 10, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Remand filed by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Anada, Tarak) Modified on 8/15/2018 to replace main doc. per R. Doc. 28 (SWE).
August 9, 2018 Filing 24 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against URS Corporation Architecture, P.C., URS Corporation, L O'Neal Johnson, Thomas E. Ryan, II, filed by URS Corporation Architecture, P.C., URS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Affidavit)(LLH)
August 9, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against URS Corporation Architecture, P.C., URS Corporation, L O'Neal Johnson, Thomas E. Ryan, II, filed by URS Corporation Architecture, P.C., URS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Affidavit)(LLH)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Notice of Removal filed by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C. The Second Amended Notice of Removal [16-1] and attachments shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/9/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal filed by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C. Record Document 8-1 and attachments shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/9/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) Modified on 8/9/2018 to edit the text (NLT).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Considering the length of the underlying motion, Defendants' opposition to the Motion to Remand may not exceed 20 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/8/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Added attorney Tarak Anada as additional counsel of record for defendants URS Corporation and URS Corporation Architecture, P.C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
August 6, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , #17 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Tarak Anada as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 6, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Permission to File Memorandum in Opposition in Excess of Page Limitations by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Smith, Meghan) Modified on 8/6/2018 to edit text. (EDC).
August 6, 2018 Filing 17 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Tarak Anada as Attorney by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Smith, Meghan)
August 6, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 3, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Notice of Removal by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Second Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 1 of 17, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 2 of 17, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 3 of 17, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 4 of 17, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 5 of 17, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 6 of 17, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 7 of 17, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 8 of 17, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 9 of 17, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 10 of 17, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 11 of 17, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 12 of 17, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 13 of 17, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 14 of 17, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 15 of 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 16 of 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Part 17 of 17, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Meghan Smith)(Smith, Meghan) (Attachments 3, 6, 9, 10, 12-17, 19 replaced on 8/6/2018) (EDC). Modified on 8/6/2018 to rotate pages. (EDC).
July 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: the matter of H&E Equipment Services, Inc. v. URS Corporation Architecture PC, Civil Action 18-690-JWD-RLB, is hereby TRANSFERRED to District Judge Brian A. Jackson. Case reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson for all further proceedings. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson and Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/27/2018. (SWE)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Expedited Hearing on #11 Motion to Remand. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand within the time allowed by Local Rule 7(f). The Court will rule on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/23/2018. (LLH)
July 23, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #10 MOTION to Remand filed by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Meghan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Proceedings by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C. (Smith, Meghan)
July 20, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Remand , #11 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #10 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
July 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #10 MOTION to Remand by H&E Equipment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Mince, Loretta)
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by H&E Equipment Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, B & C)(Mince, Loretta)
July 19, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tony M. Clayton and the law firm of Clayton, Fruge & Ward are withdrawn as counsel for the defendants in this matter. Christoffer C. Friend and Meghan E. Smith will remain as counsel for defendants, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C., URS Corporation, L. O'Neal Johnson, and Thomas E. Ryan, II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/18/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
July 18, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Architecture, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (1 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (2 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (3 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (4 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (5 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (6 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (7 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (8 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (9 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (10 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (11 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (12 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (13 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (14 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (15 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (16 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (17 of 17) to Amended Notice of Removal, #20 Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Meghan E. Smith, #21 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order Granting Leave)(Smith, Meghan) Modified on 7/19/2018 to rotate and replace exhibits 6-9, 10-19 (LLH).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Strike 1 Notice of Removal. For the reasons set forth in the motion, R. Doc. 1 shall be struck and R. Doc. 2 will be considered the operative Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/18/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
July 17, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Strike 1 Notice of Removal, , #6 MOTION for Tony M. Clayton to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
July 17, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Tony M. Clayton to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Smith, Meghan)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 Exhibit(s) to #2 Notice of Removal, by All Defendants. (Smith, Meghan) Modified on 7/17/2018 to rotate and replace (LLH).
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 Exhibit(s) to #2 Notice of Removal, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #2 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #3 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #4 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #5 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #6 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #7 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #8 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #9 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #10 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #11 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #12 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #13 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #14 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #15 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record, #16 Exhibit R. Doc. 2 in record)(Smith, Meghan) . Modified on 7/17/2018 to rotate and replace exhibits 3, 6, 8, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14 (LLH). (Main Document 4 and attachments 3,5, 6,9,11,13-16 replaced on 7/17/2018) (EDC). Modified on 7/17/2018 to rotate pages. (EDC).
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Strike 1 Notice of Removal, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Smith, Meghan)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, State of Louisiana, Case Number 626308. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1794353), filed by URS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (Notice of Manual Attachment), #3 Exhibit 2 (Affidavit of Meghan E. Smith))(Smith, Meghan)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, State of Louisiana, Case Number 626308. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1794344), filed by URS Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Notice of Manual Attachment))(Smith, Meghan) Modified on 7/19/2018to remove document as it has been stricken (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H&E Equipment Services, Inc. v. URS Corporation Architecture PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&E Equipment Services, Inc.
Represented By: Loretta G. Mince
Represented By: Rebecca Sha
Represented By: Alysson L. Mills
Represented By: Brent B. Barriere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS Corporation
Represented By: Christoffer C. Friend
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Represented By: Meghan Smith
Represented By: Don S. McKinney
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Represented By: Philip Anthony Franco
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Richardson
Represented By: Eugene R. Groves
Represented By: Ronald J. Sholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Ryan, II
Represented By: Meghan Smith
Represented By: Christoffer C. Friend
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Represented By: Don S. McKinney
Represented By: Philip Anthony Franco
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Richardson
Represented By: Eugene R. Groves
Represented By: Ronald J. Sholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS Corporation Architecture, P.C.
Represented By: Christoffer C. Friend
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Represented By: Meghan Smith
Represented By: Don S. McKinney
Represented By: Tarak Anada
Represented By: Philip Anthony Franco
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Richardson
Represented By: Eugene R. Groves
Represented By: Ronald J. Sholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L O'Neal Johnson
Represented By: Christoffer C. Friend
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Represented By: Meghan Smith
Represented By: Don S. McKinney
Represented By: Philip Anthony Franco
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Richardson
Represented By: Eugene R. Groves
Represented By: Ronald J. Sholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?