Sherrod v. Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roderick Sherrod and Princess Sherrod
Defendant: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc., David Ray Wallace, Edward S. Schmidt, Howard J. Rush, Howard J. Rush, III and Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00746
Filed: August 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave to Add Additional Exhibit to Document 12 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Add Additional Exhibit to Document 12 by Princess Sherrod. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Exhibit to be Added to Doc. 12, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Hooks, Kenneth)
September 12, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Request for Leave to File Reply to the Omnibus Opposition to the Motion for Sanctions, Remand, and Abstention, and to Contingent Motions for Leave to Amend and for Enlargement of Time. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 Opposed REQUEST for Leave to File Reply to the Omnibus Opposition to the Motion for Sanctions, Remand, and Abstention, and to Contingent Motions for Leave to Amend and for Enlargement of Time by Princess Sherrod. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit "1" Proposed Pldg, #3 Exhibit "A" to Proposed Pldg, #4 Exhibit "B" to Proposed Pldg, #5 Exhibit "C" to Proposed Pldg, #6 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Hooks, Kenneth) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit text (SGO).
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 Omnibus Opposition and Contingent Motions to #4 MOTION to Remand and/or Abstain filed by Howard J. Rush, III, Edward S. Schmidt, David Ray Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Person, Bradley) Modified on 8/31/2018 to edit text (SGO).
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Princess Sherrod, filed by Howard J. Rush, III, Edward S. Schmidt.(Person, Bradley)
August 31, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Request for Leave to Supplement Petitioner's Motion to Remand and/or Abstain. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Leave to Supplement Petitioner's Motion to Remand and/or Abstain by Princess Sherrod. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum to Supplement, #2 Attachment Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Hooks, Kenneth) Modified on 8/31/2018 to edit text (SGO).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Michael J. Remondet, Jr. be and he is hereby enrolled as counsel of record for HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/28/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 22, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Enroll Michael J. Remondet, Jr. as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Enroll Michael J. Remondet, Jr. as Attorney by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order allowing attorney to enroll in case)(Remondet, Michael)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The 5 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notices is hereby STRICKEN from the record for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(14). Barbara B. Parsons shall be added to the docket in light of her appearance on the #4 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notices (with Certificate of Service) by Princess Sherrod (Parsons, Barbara) Modified on 8/15/2018 to remove the document as it has been stricken per R. Doc. 6 (SWE).
August 10, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Remand and/or Abstain. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand and/or Abstain by Princess Sherrod. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Hooks, Kenneth) Modified on 8/10/2018 to rotate pages in Attachment 3, 5, 6 (SGO).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal and Exhibits. The clerk's office is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with 2-1, R. Doc. 1-2 with 2-2 and R. Doc. 1-3 with 2-3. R. Doc. 2-4 shall be filed as an additional exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 7, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Howard J. Rush, Edward S. Schmidt, David Ray Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal, #2 Attachment Exhibit A, #3 Attachment Exhibit B, #4 Attachment Exhibit C, #5 Order)(Person, Bradley) Modified on 8/7/2018 to rotate pages in attachment 4 (SGO).
August 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nineteenth Judicial District, Case Number 651-661, Section D. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1810965), filed by Howard J. Rush, Edward S. Schmidt, David Ray Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Person, Bradley) Modified on 8/6/2018 to rotate and replace exhibits(LLH). ( #4 Attachment Motion to Sub Plaintiff) . Modified on 8/8/2018 to Replace and add documents as per Order # 3 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherrod v. Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Sherrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princess Sherrod
Represented By: Barbara B. Parsons
Represented By: Kenneth H. Hooks, III
Represented By: Henry Price Mounger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse L. Wimberly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ray Wallace
Represented By: Bradley Lance Person
Represented By: James L. Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S. Schmidt
Represented By: Bradley Lance Person
Represented By: James L. Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard J. Rush
Represented By: Bradley Lance Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard J. Rush, III
Represented By: Bradley Lance Person
Represented By: James L. Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J. Remondet, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?