Dixon v. Restore Louisiana Homeowner Program et al

Plaintiff: Micheal Joseph Dixon
Defendant: Restore Louisiana Homeowner Program and Federal Emergency Management Agency
Case Number: 3:2018cv00747
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
0 Judge: Shelly D Dick
1 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:4000
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2018 13 Summons Issued as to Federal Emergency Management Agency, Restore Louisiana Homeowner Program. (NOTICE: Summons submitted to USM for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SGO)
September 20, 2018 12 Featured Case NOTICE AND ORDER granting #8 Petition Challenging Order Denying to Proceed inForma Pauperis. Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file Plaintiff's complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The U. S. Marshal Service shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendant(s) wherever found. A copy of this Notice and Order shall be sent to Plaintiff by certified mail, return receipt requested to the address listed on PACER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/19/2018. (SGO)
September 10, 2018 11 NOTICE of Supplement to #8 Petition Challenging #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis by Micheal Joseph Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(EDC) Modified on 9/13/2018 to edit the linking (NLT).
September 5, 2018 10 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipt Returned on Micheal Joseph Dixon on August 31, 2018 re #9 Order. (EDC)
August 27, 2018 9 Featured Case NOTICE AND ORDER: Plaintiff shall, within fourteen (14) days of this Notice and Order, submit a Supplement to his Petition Challenging Order Denying to Proceed in Forma Pauper is providing evidence or documentation supporting his contention that the $30,000 held in Plaintiff's savings account is frozen and/or off limits to Plaintiff and should therefore be treated as if it doesn't exist. A copy of this Notice and Order shall be sent to Plaintiff by certified mail, return receipt requested to the address listed on PACER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/27/2018. (SGO) Modified on 8/27/2018 to edit typo (SGO). Modified on 8/28/2018 to edit the text (NLT).
August 27, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Reconsideration of #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis,. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 24, 2018 8 Petition Challenging #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Micheal Joseph Dixon. (EDC)
August 24, 2018 7 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipt Returned on Michael Dixon re #6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (EDC)
August 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Filing Fee due by 9/28/2018. (SWE)
August 17, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee of $400 by no later than 9/28/2018. Failure to timely pay the filing fee may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without further notice from the court. The clerks office is directed to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff by certified mail return receipt requested to the address listed on PACER. Certified Mail Receipt 7004 1160 0003 2648 5959. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/17/2018. (SWE)
August 17, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to pay the filing fee.. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 16, 2018 5 PETITION/MOTION for Extension of Time to pay the filing fee by Micheal Joseph Dixon. (EDC)
August 16, 2018 4 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipt Returned on Micheal Joseph Dixon re #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (EDC)
August 9, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff shall pay the filing fee by 8/23/2018. Upon receipt of the filing fee, summons may be issued. The plaintiff(s) is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s). The clerks office is directed to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff by certified mail return receipt requested to the address listed on PACER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/9/2018. (SGO)
August 6, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 3, 2018 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Micheal Joseph Dixon. (EDC)
August 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Emergency Management Agency, Restore Louisiana Homeowner Program, filed by Micheal Joseph Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 envelope)(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Restore Louisiana Homeowner Program et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restore Louisiana Homeowner Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Joseph Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?