Sullivan v. Siemens Generation
Plaintiff: Roy Sullivan
Defendant: Siemens Generation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00748
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/24/2018. (SWE)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Siemens Generation. (NOTICE: Summons submitted to USM for service.) (LLH)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The U. S. Marshal Service shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendant wherever found. Plaintiff will be required to provide to the United States Marshal a completed U.S. Marshal Form 285 (attached) for each defendant to be served. The United States Marshal will not serve the defendant without a properly completed form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 USM -285 Form)(LLH)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Additional Documents in Support of to #1 Complaint filed by Roy Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(EDC) Modified on 9/6/2018 to edit the text (NLT).
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Certified Mail Receipt Returned on Roy Sullivan on August 20, 2018 by Roy Sullivan re #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (EDC)
August 16, 2018 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2018. (LLH)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and shall NOT issue summons until directed to do so by the court. The U.S. Marshall shall NOT serve the defendant until directed to do so by the court. Plaintiff shall complete and return the attached form within 21 days of this order to supplement the complaint filed. The clerks office is directed to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff by certified mail return receipt requested. Certified Mail Return Receipt 7004 1160 0003 2648 1661. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (LLH).
August 6, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roy Sullivan. (EDC)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Siemens Generation, filed by Roy Sullivan.(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Siemens Generation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Generation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?