Schott v. Massengale et al
Plaintiff: Martin A. Schott
Defendant: Shelley s. Massengale, C-Squared Management, LLC, Executive Development Advisors, LLC, Mickey J. Guidry, Jesse Daigle, RC Consulting of Louisiana, LLC, Ryan Forsthoff, Skellan Medical, LLC and Matthew Skellan
Undetermined: United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana
Debtor: InforMD, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00759
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference to permit the District Court to preside over all claims asserted in this proceeding and to conduct a jury trial, and for any and all other relief. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 09/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Scheduling Conference has been CONVERTED to a Telephone Conference on 10/11/2018 at 01:30 PM. The deadline of 9/27/2018 to submit a Status Report is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/24/2018. (LLH)
August 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry) (JSL)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 9/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/30/2018. (JSL). Modified on 8/30/2018 to remove restriction and modify time as per chambers (SGO).
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by C-Squared Management, LLC, Shelley s. Massengale. (Attachments: #1 Letter from LAMB)(LLH)
August 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge John W. deGravelles and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schott v. Massengale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin A. Schott
Represented By: Jeanne C. Comeaux
Represented By: Claude F. Reynaud, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley s. Massengale
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Represented By: Thomas M. McEachin
Represented By: McClain R. Schonekas
Represented By: William E. Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C-Squared Management, LLC
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Represented By: Thomas M. McEachin
Represented By: McClain R. Schonekas
Represented By: William E. Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Development Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Brandon A. Brown
Represented By: Kirk A. Patrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey J. Guidry
Represented By: Brandon A. Brown
Represented By: Kirk A. Patrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Daigle
Represented By: Kirk A. Patrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RC Consulting of Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Brandon A. Brown
Represented By: Kirk A. Patrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Forsthoff
Represented By: Brandon A. Brown
Represented By: Kirk A. Patrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skellan Medical, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Siemssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Skellan
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Siemssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: InforMD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?