Liberty Personal Insurance Company v. Abide et al
Appellant: Liberty Personal Insurance Company
Undetermined: United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana
Appellee: Samera Abide, Steven P Lemoine, Ben Todd, Michael Todd, Paula Todd, American General Life Insurance Company and Samera L Abide
Case Number: 3:2018cv00800
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 Appellee's BRIEF by Samera L Abide, Steven P Lemoine. Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/8/2018. (Lemoine, Steven)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 Appellant's BRIEF by Liberty Personal Insurance Company. (Joyce, John)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Standing filed by Liberty Personal Insurance Company. (Joyce, John)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 Appellees' Designation of Record on Appeal by United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Designation Letter)(LLH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Standing by Samera L Abide, Steven P Lemoine. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lemoine, Steven) Modified on 9/13/2018 to edit the text (KAH).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Designation of Documents by United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana as to Bankruptcy Petition #18-10030. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(LLH)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number: Adversary Proceeding 18-1016. File received, filed by Liberty Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Appeal, #2 Order Being Appealed, #3 Transmittal Letter)(LLH)
August 28, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Personal Insurance Company v. Abide et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Liberty Personal Insurance Company
Represented By: John W. Joyce
Represented By: Catherine Fornias Giarrusso
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: United States Bankruptcy Court, Middle District of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Samera Abide
Represented By: Samera L. Abide
Represented By: Steven P. Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Steven P Lemoine
Represented By: Steven P. Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ben Todd
Represented By: Derren Straughan Johnson
Represented By: Peter A. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Todd
Represented By: Samuel Bradley Rhorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Paula Todd
Represented By: Samuel Bradley Rhorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Margaret V Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Samera L Abide
Represented By: Steven P. Lemoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?