Laird v. Woodlawn Development Incorporated

Plaintiff: Donna Laird
Defendant: Woodlawn Development incorporated and Hendrick Construction, INC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00801
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hendrick Construction, Inc. (Raines, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hendrick Construction, Inc.(Raines, James)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/30/2018. (BLR)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Woodlawn Development Incorporated. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) Modified on 8/30/2018 to edit text (SGO).
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hendrick Construction, Inc. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) Modified on 8/30/2018 to edit text (SGO).
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The plaintiff(s) is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/29/2018. (BLR)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons The summons are incomplete and therefore, will not be issued. (NLT)
August 29, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donna Laird. (NLT)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donna Laird, filed by Donna Laird. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Pauper Form, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons, #4 Attachment Summons)(Hodge, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laird v. Woodlawn Development Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodlawn Development incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrick Construction, INC
Represented By: Kelsey A. Clark
Represented By: Murphy James Foster, III
Represented By: James R. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Laird
Represented By: Donald Carl Hodge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?