Holding One, Inc. v. Pro One LLC

Plaintiff: Holding One, Inc.
Defendant: Pro One LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00806
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
1 Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Holding One, Inc.. (Hicks, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Pro One LLC. (Sims, Sandra)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Pro One LLC. (Sims, Sandra)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pro One LLC.(Sims, Sandra)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Pro One LLC (EDC)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 11:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/26/2018. (JSL)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Pro One LLC, d/b/a Pro One Corp formerly named Property One Group, LLC by Holding One, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Pleading; Clerk's Entry of Default)(Hicks, Michael)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holding One, Inc.. Pro One LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Hicks, Michael)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pro One LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SGO)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (SGO)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Submitted (Hicks, Michael) Modified on 8/30/2018 to flatten document (SGO).
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pro One d/b/a Pro One Corp formerly named Property One Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1824220.), filed by Holding One, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Hicks, Michael) Modified on 8/30/2018 to flatten documents (SGO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holding One, Inc. v. Pro One LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holding One, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brent Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro One LLC
Represented By: Sandra Destin Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?