Jackson v. University House Baton Rouge, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kia Jackson
Defendant: University House Baton Rouge, LLC and City of Baton Rouge
Case Number: 3:2018cv00934
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress against City of Baton Rouge, University House Baton Rouge, LLC, filed by Kia Jackson.(KAH)
October 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines (Court Use Only) (SGO)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: Plaintiff shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a motion to substitute her Complaint with a proposed pleading that is a comprehensive amended complaint (i.e., includes all of Plaintiff's numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended), which adequately alleges the citizenship of all parties to establish that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over the case and which will become the operative complaint in this matter without reference to any other document in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/24/2018. (BLR)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Baton Rouge, University House Baton Rouge, LLC. (NOTICE:Summons submitted to the USM) (NLT) Modified on 10/24/2018 to edit the text (NLT).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The USM shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendant(s) wherever found. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/23/2018. (NLT)
October 22, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kia Jackson. (EDC)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Baton Rouge, University House Baton Rouge, LLC, filed by Kia Jackson.(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. University House Baton Rouge, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University House Baton Rouge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kia Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?