Lotief v. Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System, et al
Plaintiff: Joseph E Savoie, Jessica C Leger, Michael P Lotief, Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System and Bryan Maggard
Defendant: E. Joseph Savoie and Jessica Clarke Leger
Case Number: 3:2018cv00991
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Strike filed by Michael P Lotief. (McElligott, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 16 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #7 Pending Motion to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2019 is CANCELED. Not status report is due at this time. The court will review this matter in 120 days. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE AND ORDER: Per the #13 Opposition to Petition of Intervention, for Declaratory Judgment and for Damages, Defendants oppose the intervention of Chelsea Lotief, Doni Sanders, Miranda Grotenhuis, Sarah Koeppen, and Teryn Haley Pritchett (Intervenors). Defendants assert that Intervenors filed a Petition of Intervention just prior to removal being effected in the state court proceedings. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Intervenors shall file, within fourteen (14) days of this Notice and Order a Motion to Intervene Pursuant to FRCP 24. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #13 Opposition to Petition of Intervention, for Declaratory Judgment and for Damages is STRICKEN from the record. Defendants may file an amended opposition to the Motion to Intervene Pursuant to FRCP 24 within the briefing delays provided in this Courts local rules. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall ensure Intervenors receive notice of this Notice and Order within three (3) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 Reply Brief in support #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana , #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie. (Fontenot, Cearley) Modified on 12/19/2018 to edit text (ELW).
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE Opposition to Petition of Intervention filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fontenot, Cearley)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana with certificate of service filed by Michael P Lotief. (McElligott, John)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #9 MOTION to Strike : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie.(Fontenot, Cearley)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Fontenot, Cearley)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(Fontenot, Cearley)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Supplemental Motion for Extension. Defendants answer due 12/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 13, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Fontenot, Cearley)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice the #3 Unopposed Motion for Extension for failure to show good cause as required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/13/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 7, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time answer or present other defenses and objections MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension by Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System, Jessica Clarke Leger, Bryan Maggard, E. Joseph Savoie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Fontenot, Cearley) Modified on 11/7/2018 to edit text (SGO).
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/6/2018. (DCB)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 674190. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1856160), filed by Jessica C Leger, Bryan Maggard, Joseph E Savoie, Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Fontenot, Cearley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lotief v. Board of Supervisors of the University of Louisiana System, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E Savoie
Represented By: Cearley W. Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica C Leger
Represented By: Cearley W. Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P Lotief
Represented By: John E. McElligott, Jr.
Represented By: Theodore G. Edwards, IV
Represented By: Scott Michael Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Supervisors for the University of Louisiana System
Represented By: Cearley W. Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Maggard
Represented By: Cearley W. Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Joseph Savoie
Represented By: Cearley W. Fontenot
Represented By: Lawrence E. Marino
Represented By: Stephen J. Oats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Clarke Leger
Represented By: Cearley W. Fontenot
Represented By: Lawrence E. Marino
Represented By: Stephen J. Oats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?