Davis v. State Bank and Trust Company
Plaintiff: Latisha E. Davis
Defendant: State Bank and Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00993
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/14/2018. (SWE)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to State Bank and Trust Company. (Summons submitted to USM for service.) (SWE) Modified on 11/8/2018 to edit text (SGO).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment US Marshal Form 285) (SWE)
November 2, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Latisha E. Davis. (EDC)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Bank and Trust Company, filed by Latisha E. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. State Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latisha E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?