Katchadurian v. Premier Control Systems, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: James Katchadurian and Premier Control Systems, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01049
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Status Report by James Katchadurian. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Leave to File Ex Parte Status Report, #2 Proposed Pleading; Status Report)(Prather, Kelly)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Premier Control Systems, L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Submitted (Prather, Kelly) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/9/2019 to flatten the image) (NLT).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/24/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2018. (NLT)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Kelly G. Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/14/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Oath as to #8 MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Wolf, Rosalind) Modified on 12/13/2018 to edit the text (NLT).
December 10, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1872492). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1872492) by James Katchadurian. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Wolf, Rosalind)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(8)(C)(D). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/06/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 30, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1868950). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Kelly Greenwood Prather to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1868950) by James Katchadurian. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Proposed Pleading;)(Wolf, Rosalind)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Premier Control Systems, LLC. The summons was submitted by an attorney who is not admitted at Middle District of Louisiana. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (EDC)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of civil cover sheet filing by James Katchadurian (Wolf, Rosalind)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Anthony Marino regarding Kelly Greenwood Prather who is Co-Counsel for party James Katchadurian, Litigation Trustee. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/30/2018) (EDC).
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Submitted (Wolf, Rosalind) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/29/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/29/2018 to flatten document. (EDC).
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers by James Katchadurian, Litigation Trustee against Premier Control Systems, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1868022.), filed by James Katchadurian. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Wolf, Rosalind) Modified on 11/29/2018 to edit text. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katchadurian v. Premier Control Systems, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Katchadurian
Represented By: Anthony C. Marino
Represented By: Rosalind Goldberg Wolf
Represented By: Kelly Greenwood Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Control Systems, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?