Abdullah v. Gulf Coast Housing Partnership et al

Plaintiff: Wali Hassan Abdullah
Defendant: Restoration of Baton Rouge, Shalandria Branch and Gulf Coast Housing Partnership
Case Number: 3:2018cv01059
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 12:1703
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel: In light of all defendants having not made an appearance in this matter, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 4/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 01:00 PM in chambers. Status Report due by 1/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/18/2018. (SWE)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Shalandria Branch, Gulf Coast Housing Partnership, Restoration of Baton Rouge. (NOTICE:Summons sent to the USM for Service) (NLT)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendants and the USM shall serve the defendants wherever found. The USM will not serve the defendant without a properly completed USM 285 form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/04/2018. (NLT)
December 3, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wali Hassan Abdullah. (SGO)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shalandria Branch, Gulf Coast Housing Partnership, Restoration of Baton Rouge filed by Wali Hassan Abdullah. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(SGO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdullah v. Gulf Coast Housing Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restoration of Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalandria Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Housing Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wali Hassan Abdullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?