Cannon v. Port Allen City Police Department
Plaintiff: Robert L. Cannon, Jr.
Defendant: Port Allen City Police Department
Case Number: 3:2018cv01061
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel: In light of the defendant having not made an appearance in the matter, good cause is shown to reset Scheduling Conference to 4/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte/Interim STATUS REPORT by Robert L. Cannon, Jr. (Hightower, Edwin) Modified on 1/24/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/18/2018. (ELW)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Port Allen City Police Department. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Employment Discrimination against Port Allen City Police Department ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1870376.), filed by Robert L. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit - Verification, #2 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment Civil Summons)(Hightower, Edwin) (Attachments 4-5 replaced on 12/4/2018) (EDC). Modified on 12/4/2018 to flatten documents.(EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon v. Port Allen City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Cannon, Jr.
Represented By: Edwin L. Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Allen City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?