Kasem v. Boat U.S. et al

Plaintiff: Bassam Kasem
Defendant: National Liability and Fire Insurance Company and Boat U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01062
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for January 31, 2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2019. Discovery due by 9/30/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 9/30/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 9/30/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 12/2/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 12/31/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 1/31/2020. Motions shall be filed by 3/31/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 8/18/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 9/8/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 10/2/2020. Bench Trial set for 10/13/2020 - 10/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/25/2019. (JSL)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT of Bassam Kasem and by Boat U.S., Inc., National Liability and Fire Insurance Company. (Malish, Jedd)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/14/2018. (JSL)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Boat U.S., Inc., National Liability and Fire Insurance Company.(SWE)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-675955. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1870505), filed by National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, Boat U.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Pleading; Answer)(Malish, Jedd) Modified on 12/4/2018 to flatten pages (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kasem v. Boat U.S. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Liability and Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jedd S. Malish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boat U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Jedd S. Malish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bassam Kasem
Represented By: John A. London, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?