Ascension Parish Government v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Ascension Parish Government
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., INSYS Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Morris and Dickson Co., LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc, Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01088
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 Return on Electronic Transfer from Ohio Northern. (NLT)
January 23, 2019 Filing 18 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Ohio Northern. (NLT)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 JPML Order)(NLT)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER lifting the Stay of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-73) (Attachments: #1 NEF from JPML Court, #2 Minute Order)(NLT)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion to Continue Submission of Plaintiffs Motion for Remand for good cause shown. It is hereby further ordered that the submission of Plaintiffs Motion for Remand is continued without date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/15/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 14, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Consent MOTION to Continue Submission of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Continue Submission of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by McKesson Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Williams, Stacey)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is GRANTED IN PART. All Manufacturing Defendants shall have up to, through and including 30 days after the later of (1) this Court's ruling on the pending motion remand, or (2) the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation enters a final order granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order or a final decision otherwise denying transfer to the MDL to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/4/2019. (KAH)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is GRANTED IN PART. McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation and Cardinal Health, Inc. shall have up to, through and including 30 days after the later of (1) this Court's ruling on the pending motion to remand, or (2) the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation enters a final order granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order or a final decision otherwise denying transfer to the MDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/4/2019. (KAH)
January 4, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ascension Parish Government. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Leger, Walter)
December 27, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Crisler, Richard)
December 26, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Time to File Responsive Pleadings by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Williams, Stacey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Notice of Collateral Proceedings by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Supplemental Notice of Removal by McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Williams, Stacey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Proceedings by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Crisler, Richard)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Holdings Cooperative U.A., Corporate Parent Orvet UK Unlimited, Corporate Parent IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc... (Crisler, Richard)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Walter J. Leger, Jr. regarding Brigid E. Collins who is Co-Counsel for party Ascension Parish Government. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (SWE)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC Parish of Ascension, Case Number 123831. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1877414), filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Attachment Attorney List)(Crisler, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ascension Parish Government v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: William Michael Adams
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Samuel E. Masur
Represented By: Paul Byrd Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel E. Masur
Represented By: Paul Byrd Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris and Dickson Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc
Represented By: Franklin J. Foil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel E. Masur
Represented By: Paul Byrd Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: David O'Quinn
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Leland G. Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Taylor
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ascension Parish Government
Represented By: Walter J. Leger, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Spencer Long
Represented By: Franklin G. Shaw
Represented By: Matthew Scott Landry
Represented By: Walter John Leger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?