Johnson v. Credit One Bank
Plaintiff: Paul Michael Johnson
Defendant: Credit One Bank
Case Number: 3:2018cv01104
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to Plaintiff: The Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge submitted to the court will not be filed into the record. Pursuant to #2 Scheduling Conference Order "the signed consent form must be filed with the court electronically, but ONLY AFTER ALL PARTIES HAVE SIGNED THE FORM." The defendant did not sign the form submitted to the court. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: In light of the defendant having not made an appearance, the Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 is CANCELED. The Scheduling Conference is reset for 5/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. A JOINT Status Report is due by 4/25/2019. It is ORDERED that the clerk strike the Status Report (R. Doc. 3) for failure to comply with the #2 Scheduling Conference Order. Leave of court is required prior to parties filing a separate status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/21/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD STATUS REPORT by Paul Michael Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(EDC) Modified on 2/22/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with RD 4 (SWE).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 01:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/21/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/4/2019. (SGO)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit One Bank (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4699028931.), filed by Paul Michael Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Order for Summary Judgement and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Credit One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?