Bryant v. Waddell, et al

Plaintiff: Brendon Bryant
Defendant: Tina Waddell
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00011
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Tina Waddell (UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL)served on 2/13/2019,VIA CERTIFIED MAIL answer due 3/6/2019. (US Marshal, ) Main Document 6 replaced on 2/25/2019 at the request of USM. Wrong document attached (BLR).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action for judicial review of the administrative decision shall proceed in accordance with the schedule stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/16/2019. (KAH)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Tina Waddell. Summons submitted to the USM for service (ELW) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/18/2019) (ELW). Modified on 1/18/2019 to correct page orientation (ELW).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The U. S. Marshal Service shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendant(s) wherever found. Plaintiff(s) will be required to provide to the United States Marshal a completed U.S. Marshal Form 285 for each defendant to be served. The United States Marshal will not serve the defendant without a properly completed form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 01/09/2019. (ELW)
January 8, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brendon Bryant. (EDC)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tina Waddell, filed by Brendon Bryant. (Attachments: #1 summons)(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Waddell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendon Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?