Terry v. GoBuryMe, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Mary Katherine Terry
Defendant: Kevin King, GoBuryMe LLC, Clark Brothers, LLC, Silver Linging Funeral Services LLC, Precision Solutions Incorporated, Greg Clark and Alejandro Velasquez
Case Number: 3:2019cv00024
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Brian A Jackson
1 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Mary Katherine Terry. (Kalis, Sarah)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 3/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/16/2019. (LLH)
January 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00181. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case transferred to District of Middle District of Louisiana: IT IS ORDERED that this matter is hereby transferred to Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/11/2019.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/14/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 Report Regarding Patent & Trademark. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/14/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/14/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7353581) filed by Mary Katherine Terry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Galen M. Hair added to party Mary Katherine Terry(pty:pla).(Hair, Galen) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (mm). (SERVICE BY WAIVER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. GoBuryMe, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoBuryMe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Brothers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Linging Funeral Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Solutions Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Katherine Terry
Represented By: Galen M Hair
Represented By: Sarah Kalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?