Johnson v. Roan
Plaintiff: Xavier Johnson
Defendant: Darrel Roan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00025
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Motion to Show Cause hearing before Judge Brian A. Jackson held on 1/18/2019. Court Reporter: Natalie W. Breaux, RPR, CRR. Phone Number: (225) 389-3565. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.lamd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2019. (Breaux, Natalie)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Strike 8 Transcript Request and 9 MOTION to Substitute Corrected Transcript request. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/20/2019. (SWE)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document by Xavier Johnson. (Messina, Joseph)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Xavier Johnson for proceedings held on 1/18/19 before Judge Brian Jackson.. (Messina, Joseph)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD MOTION to Substitute Corrected Transcript request by Xavier Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Messina, Joseph) Modified on 2/22/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with RD 12 (SWE).
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Xavier Johnson for proceedings held on January 18, 2019 before Judge Richard Bourgeois Jr. (Messina, Joseph) Modified on 2/22/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with RD 12 (SWE).
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Return on Order to show cause. Served 01/17/2019. (US Marshal, )
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the record, Petitioner Xavier Johnson is hereby RELEASED from the custody of the State of Louisiana, effective IMMEDIATELY. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/18/2019. (LLH)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Show Cause Hearing held on 1/18/2019. Counsel for the Defendant addressed the Court. Warden Darrel Roan, FBI Sepecial Agent Jacob Dettmering, and Asst. United States Attorney Paul Pugliese are questioned by the Court. Exhibit P1, Appearance Bond as to Xavier Johnson filed 12/17/2018 in the 20th JDC, Parish of West Feliciana, State of Louisiana, is admitted. For reasons read into the record, the Court grants the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Plaintiff (doc. 1) and orders that Xavier Johnson be and is hereby immediately released from the custody of the State of Louisiana. (Court Reporter N. Breaux.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) Pursuant to Local Rules, offering parties shall retain custody of exhibits..(PJH)
January 17, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing reset for 1/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Warden Roan, SPA Dettmering, Catahoula Correctional Center, and Rodney Messina notified via telephone and/or through USM Service of time change. (PJH)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Expedited Hearing. It is ordered that Darrel Roan, Warden of West Feliciana Parish Prison, produce Petitioner, Xavier Johnson, for a hearing relating to Petitioner's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus set for 1/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/17/2019. (SWE) Modified on 1/17/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE : The parties listed herein to appear for Show Cause Hearing set for 1/18/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Brian A. Jackson. United States Marshal serve the listed parties with a copy of this Order to Show Cause. ORDERED that this Order to Show Cause, and the facts contained herein, SHALL SERVE AS NOTICE of the Court's intention to grant Petitioner's Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 and order Petitioner's immediate release from custody. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 01/16/2019. (ELW)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Xavier Johnson. (Messina, Joseph)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ALAMDC-1885934.), filed by Xavier Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Messina, Joseph) Modified on 1/14/2019 to edit the text (NLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Roan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Roan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Rodney Messina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?