Sims et al v. Brown, et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Sims
Defendant: Darrell Brown, The Hertz Corporation and Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00026
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 First MOTION to Substitute Motion to Enroll . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Substitute Motion to Enroll by Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Attachment)(Wells, Christine)
March 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Enroll Christine E. Wells as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Enroll Christine E. Wells as Attorney by Darrell Brown, Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order to Enroll)(Wells, Christine) Modified on 3/13/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 3/14/2019. Discovery due by 9/13/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 7/12/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 8/12/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 8/12/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 9/30/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 12/2/2019. Motions shall be filed by 12/30/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/20/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 5/18/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 6/8/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 6/26/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/13/2020 - 7/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/12/2019. (SGO)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Darrell Brown, The Hertz Corporation.(Kaplan, Howard)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Raymond Sims. (Nicolas, Andrew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF LONG ARM SERVICE WITH RETURN RECEIPT by Raymond Sims. (Nicolas, Andrew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF LONG ARM SERVICE by Raymond Sims. (Nicolas, Andrew)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL Pursuant to 28 USCA 1441, Et Seq. against Raymond Sims, filed by The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Kaplan, Howard) Modified on 2/1/2019 to rotate attachment (KAH).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, that, on or before 2/8/2019, the removing defendant shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of defendant Darrell Brown, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/29/2019. (KAH)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 11:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 2/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/24/2019. (SGO)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 677190. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1886043), filed by The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaplan, Howard) (Attachment 6 replaced on 1/14/2019 to correct the page orientation) (NLT). Modified on 3/4/2019 to flatten and replace civil cover (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims et al v. Brown, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Brown
Represented By: Stephen N. Elliott
Represented By: Howard Bruce Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Represented By: Stephen N. Elliott
Represented By: Howard Bruce Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine E Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Sims
Represented By: Andrew Klein Nicolas
Represented By: Andrew B. Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?